Johninson v. Culberson et al

Case Number: 4:2006cv01636
Filed: December 1, 2006
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Little Rock Office
Presiding Judge: George Howard
Referring Judge: H. David Young
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 5, 2010 194 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing plaintiff's Court-appointed counsel, attorney Ralph Myers III, to file a response to plaintiff's pro se 193 MOTION to Dismiss appointed counsel within ten days of the date of this Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 5/5/2010. (mkf)
January 6, 2009 149 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 144 Order which inadvertently failed to acknowledge the addition of deft John Whaley and directing the Clerk to prepare summons and the U.S. Marshal to serve a copy of the original and amended complaints and summons on deft in care of the ADC Compliance Division. Signed by Magistrate Judge Henry L. Jones, Jr on 1/6/09. (bkp)
December 31, 2008 148 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 146 Motion for Sanctions without prejudice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Henry L. Jones, Jr on 12/31/08. (bkp)
December 17, 2008 145 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing the Clerk to prepare summons for defts Lillie Phillips and J. Hipple and the U.S. Marshal to serve these defts with a copy of the original and amended complaints in care of the ADC Compliance Office without prepayment of fees. Signed by Magistrate Judge Henry L. Jones, Jr on 12/17/08. (bkp)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Johninson v. Culberson et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?