B&B Hardware Inc v. Hargis Industries Inc et al

Case Number: 4:2006cv01654
Filed: December 7, 2006
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Little Rock Office
Presiding Judge: Susan Webber Wright
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1051 Trademark Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 26, 2015 318 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing the Clerk to reassign this case due to Judge Wright's senior status. Signed at the Direction of the Court on 8/26/2015. (jak)
November 10, 2010 242 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part 211 Motion for Attorney Fees. Hargis is directed to submit an itemized statement of time spent and costs incurred within fourteen (14) days from the date of entry of this Order. B&B will be allowed seven (7) days to respond to the statement. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 11/10/10. (dac)
September 9, 2010 227 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 211 Motion for Attorney Fees in the amount of $87,852.42. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 9/9/10. (bkp)
August 31, 2010 225 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER that 213 MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law or, in the alternative, for a New Trial filed by B&B Hardware Inc is DENIED. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 8/31/10. (vjt)
July 1, 2010 208 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT, pursuant to 201 Jury Verdict, Plaintiff B&B Hardware, Inc. takes nothing on its complaint against Defendant Hargis Industries, Inc., & the complaint herein is dismissed with prejudice. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED AND ADJUDGED that Defendant Hargis Industries, Inc. is entitled to relief on counterclaim for false advertising & false designation of origin. Defendant's claim of copyright infringement is dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 7/1/2010. (jct)
May 27, 2010 146 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 115 Motion for Reconsideration and 115 Motion to Bifurcate. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 5/27/10. (bkp)
May 13, 2010 111 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting the parties' 108 Joint Motion to Extend Deadline for Filing Pretrial Disclosure Sheets; Pretrial Disclosure Sheet due by 5/24/2010. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 5/13/10. (vjt)
April 20, 2010 87 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 86 Joint Motion to Extend Time; Motions due by 5/3/2010; parties have until 4/29/10 to exchange Rebuttal Expert Reports. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 4/20/10. (vjt)
April 14, 2010 84 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting pltf's 71 Motion to Compel. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 4/14/10. (vjt)
March 31, 2010 75 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting Hargis Industries' 73 Motion for Leave to File Response in Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to Compel Under Seal. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 3/31/10. (vjt)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: B&B Hardware Inc v. Hargis Industries Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?