Hyundai Motor Finance Company v. McKay Motors I LLC et al

Case Number: 4:2006cv01714
Filed: December 20, 2006
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Little Rock Office
Presiding Judge: William R. Wilson
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Other Contract
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 8, 2008 147 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 129 Motion for Attorney Fees in the amount of $260,390.29. Signed by Judge William R. Wilson, Jr on 10/8/08. (dac)
September 3, 2008 140 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 127 Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law. Signed by Judge William R. Wilson, Jr on 9/3/08. (bkp)
December 28, 2006 9 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER extending the effectiveness of 6 Temporary Restraining Order entered on December 21, 2006 to and including January 9, 2007. Signed by Judge William R. Wilson Jr. on 12/28/06. (mkf, )
December 21, 2006 6 Opinion or Order of the Court TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER up to and including the close of business on the tenth day following the entry of this Order. Signed by Judge William R. Wilson Jr. on 12/21/06. (bkp)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hyundai Motor Finance Company v. McKay Motors I LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?