Mack v. Dillon et al

Plaintiff: Dolandon Mack
Defendant: Tim Dillon, Jana Rayburn, Kathy Trudell, Roger Swope, Scott Timmons, J C White, John Does and Little Rock, City of
Case Number: 4:2007cv00074
Filed: February 7, 2007
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Little Rock Office
County: Out of State
Presiding Judge: William R. Wilson
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
February 10, 2012 245 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER discharging Hugh Spinks as plaintiff's standby counsel. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 2/10/12. (kpr)
February 2, 2012 229 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 216 Motion in Limine. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 2/2/12. (kpr)
August 24, 2011 196 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 193 Motion for Costs and directing the Clerk of the Court to disburse $696.00 from the Library Fund to Matthews, Sanders & Sayes. The Clerk shall place a copy of this Order, together with the application, in the Library Fund file. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 8/24/11. (kpr)
July 6, 2011 160 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing the U.S. Marshal to allow Mr. Mack to bring his proposed exhibits to the 7/12/11 hearing and the trial. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 7/6/11. (vjt)
June 3, 2011 151 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing the Clerk to issue a writ of habeas corpus ad testificandum to the Warden having custody of Dolandon Mack and to the U.S.Marshal'sService, commanding that Mack be detained and brought before the Court for pretrial hearings to be set during the month of July 2011, and until the end of the trial of this matter scheduled to begin on 1 August 2011. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 6/3/2011. (mkf)
March 10, 2011 136 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER resetting the motion hearing for 3/30/2011 at 3:00 PM in Little Rock Courtroom # B-155 before Judge D. P. Marshall Jr.; the Writ, Document No. 134 , is amended accordingly; Plaintiff's counsel is directed to send this Order to Mack with the original Order 133 and the Writ. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 3/10/2011. (mkf)
April 8, 2010 93 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER appointing Eric R. Gribble to represent Plaintiff in all further proceedings and directing the Clerk to send to cousel a copy of this Order and Local Rule 83.7. Signed by Judge William R. Wilson, Jr on 4/8/10. (bkp)
December 12, 2008 75 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 74 Motion for Reconsideration re 71 Order on Motion for Summary Judgment, 72 Judgment. Signed by Judge William R. Wilson, Jr on 12/12/08. (mkf)
November 12, 2008 72 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT re 71 Order on Motion for Summary Judgment; case is DISMISSED with prejudice. Signed by Judge William R. Wilson, Jr on 11/12/08. (mkf)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mack v. Dillon et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dolandon Mack
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tim Dillon
Represented By: Bradley Sean Chafin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jana Rayburn
Represented By: Bradley Sean Chafin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kathy Trudell
Represented By: Bradley Sean Chafin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Roger Swope
Represented By: Bradley Sean Chafin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Scott Timmons
Represented By: Bradley Sean Chafin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J C White
Represented By: Bradley Sean Chafin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Little Rock, City of
Represented By: Bradley Sean Chafin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?