Brooks v. Mitchell et al

Plaintiff: Roy G Brooks
Defendant: Katherine P Mitchell, Robert M Daugherty, Little Rock School District, Baker Kurrus, Charles Armstrong, Melanie Fox, Dianne Curry and Larry Berkley
Case Number: 4:2007cv00453
Filed: April 30, 2007
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Little Rock Office
County: Pulaski
Presiding Judge: G. Thomas Eisele
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Other Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

We have record of the following docket entries for this case:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 23, 2007 56 Featured Case ORDER granting 55 Plaintiff's Motion to Dismiss. All claims asserted in this action are dismissed with prejudice, and the pending motions regarding attorney's fees and costs 38 and 41 are terminated as moot. Signed by Judge G. Thomas Eisele on 08/23/2007. (thd)
August 23, 2007 55 MOTION to Dismiss With Prejudice by Roy G Brooks (Stone, Clayborne)
August 20, 2007 54 BRIEF IN OPPOSITION filed by Katherine P Mitchell, Robert M Daugherty re 47 Amended Document, 48 Amended Document, 52 Reply (Non Motion), 51 Notice of Docket Correction, 53 Response in Opposition to Motion (Cain, Terrence)
August 20, 2007 53 RESPONSE in Opposition re 38 MOTION for Attorney Fees and Costs, 41 Supplemental MOTION for Attorney Fees and Costs filed by Katherine P Mitchell, Robert M Daugherty. (Cain, Terrence)
August 14, 2007 52 REPLY re 51 Notice of Docket Correction, LRSD's Response to Petition for Fees and Costs by Roy G Brooks (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Askew, Jess)
August 13, 2007 51 NOTICE OF DOCKET CORRECTION re: 49 Response to Supplemental Motion for Attorney's Fees. CORRECTION: The original main document was submitted in error (wrong document attached); the correct main document was added to docket entry 49 , pursuant to the attached request. (thd)
August 13, 2007 50 BRIEF IN SUPPORT filed by Little Rock School District re 49 Response to Motion (Welch, Morgan)
August 13, 2007 49 RESPONSE to Motion re 41 Supplemental MOTION for Attorney Fees and Costs filed by Little Rock School District. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1# 2 Exhibit 2)(Welch, Morgan) (MODIFICATION: The correct main document was added as an attachment on 8/13/2007.) (thd)
August 9, 2007 48 AMENDED DOCUMENT by Roy G Brooks. Amendment to 39 Brief in Support of Plaintiff's Amended Petition for Attorney's Fees and Plaintiff's Bill of Costs (Askew, Jess)
August 9, 2007 47 AMENDED DOCUMENT by Roy G Brooks. Amendment to 38 MOTION for Attorney Fees and Costs (Askew, Jess)
August 9, 2007 46 BRIEF IN SUPPORT filed by Little Rock School District re 45 Response to Motion for Fees and Costs (Welch, Morgan)
August 9, 2007 45 RESPONSE to Motion re 38 MOTION for Attorney Fees and Costs, 41 Supplemental MOTION for Attorney Fees and Costs filed by Little Rock School District. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1# 2 Exhibit 2)(Welch, Morgan)
August 9, 2007 44 Featured Case (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) ORDER granting 42 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response and 43 Motion to Amend/Correct filed by Defendants Mitchell and Daugherty. Separate Defendants have up to and including August 20, 2007, to file their response to Plaintiff's Motion for Fees and Costs. Signed by Judge G. Thomas Eisele on 8/9/07.(sgm)
August 9, 2007 43 MOTION to Amend/Correct 42 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply by Katherine P Mitchell, Robert M Daugherty (Cain, Terrence)
August 8, 2007 42 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply by Katherine P Mitchell, Robert M Daugherty (Cain, Terrence)
July 31, 2007 41 Supplemental MOTION for Attorney Fees and Costs by Roy G Brooks (Johnson, Bonnie)
July 31, 2007 40 NOTICE OF DOCKET CORRECTION re: 38 MOTION for Attorney Fees and Costs. CORRECTION: The original main document was submitted in error; the correct main document was added to docket entry 38 , pursuant to the attached request. (thd)
July 30, 2007 39 BRIEF IN SUPPORT filed by Roy G Brooks re 38 Motion for Attorney Fees, and Costs (Johnson, Bonnie)
July 30, 2007 38 MOTION for Attorney Fees and Costs by Roy G Brooks (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Fees# 2 Exhibit Costs# 3 Exhibit Bill of Costs# 4 Exhibit PSA Affidavit# 5 Exhibit Itemization# 6 Exhibit Contract# 7 Exhibit Minutes# 8 Exhibit Minutes2# 9 Exhibit BED Policy# 10 Exhibit Minutes3)(Johnson, Bonnie) (MODIFICATION: The correct main document was added as an attachment on 7/31/2007.) (thd)
May 30, 2007 37 Featured Case (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) ORDER granting both Motions to Extend Time [35 & 36]. The time for all parties to seek attorney's fees or costs of suit is hereby extended through and including July 30, 2007. Signed by Judge G. Thomas Eisele on 5/30/2007. (ere)
May 30, 2007 36 Counter MOTION to Extend Time to File a Petition for Fees or Costs by Little Rock School District (Welch, Morgan)
May 30, 2007 35 MOTION to Extend Time to File Petition for Attorneys' Fees and Costs of Suit by Roy G Brooks (Anderson, Philip)
May 24, 2007 34 TRANSCRIPT of Hearing held on 5/7/2007 before Judge G. Thomas Eisele. Court Reporter: Judith A. Ammons. (thd)
May 17, 2007 33 Featured Case ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE. The court retains jurisdiction through 5/30/2007 for the limited purpose of enforcing its prior 10 Order. Signed by Judge G. Thomas Eisele on 05/17/2007. (thd)
May 9, 2007 32 TRANSCRIPT of Hearing held on 05/09/2007 before Judge G. Thomas Eisele. Court Reporter: Judith A. Ammons. (thd)
May 9, 2007 NOTICE OF DOCKET CORRECTION re: 22 Minute Order. CORRECTION: The docket text was modified to correct the description of the document filed as "Minute Proceedings" and to correct the date of the proceedings to 5/7/2007. (thd)
May 9, 2007 31 Amended ANSWER to Amended Complaint by Little Rock School District.(Madison, Richard)
May 9, 2007 30 Minutes of Proceedings held before Judge G. Thomas Eisele : Motion Hearing held on 5/9/2007 re 2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction filed by Roy G Brooks. Discussion of Letter Order denying Motion 2 which was issued late yesterday afternoon. Comments made from the bench. (Court Reporter Judy Ammons.) (cjw) Modified on 5/9/2007 (cjw).
May 9, 2007 NOTICE OF DOCKET CORRECTION re: 29 Affidavit of Service of Summons and Amended Complaint upon Larry Berkley. CORRECTION: The docket entry was modified to correct the party filer. (thd)
May 9, 2007 29 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons and Amended Complaint, filed by Roy Brooks. Larry Berkley served on 5/7/2007. (Askew, Jess) (Docket entry modified on 5/9/2007 to correct the party filer.)(thd)
May 9, 2007 28 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons and Amended Complaint, filed by Roy G Brooks. Baker Kurrus served on 5/7/2007. (Askew, Jess)
May 9, 2007 27 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons and Amended Complaint, filed by Roy G Brooks. Charles Armstrong served on 5/7/2007. (Askew, Jess)
May 9, 2007 26 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons and Amended Complaint, filed by Roy G Brooks. Dianne Curry served on 5/7/2007. (Askew, Jess)
May 9, 2007 25 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons and Amended Complaint, filed by Roy G Brooks. Melanie Fox served on 5/7/2007. (Askew, Jess)
May 9, 2007 24 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons and Amended Complaint, filed by Roy G Brooks. Robert M Daugherty served on 5/7/2007. (Askew, Jess)
May 9, 2007 23 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons and Amended Complaint, filed by Roy G Brooks. Katherine P Mitchell served on 5/7/2007. (Askew, Jess)
May 9, 2007 22 Minute of Proceedings held before Judge G. Thomas Eisele : Motion Hearing held on 5/7/2007 re 7 Supplemental MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction filed by Roy G Brooks. After hearing testimony and evidence, the Court grants the Plaintiff's Supplemental Motion 7 . (Court Reporter Judy Ammons, Genie Power.) (cjw) Modified on 5/9/2007 (cjw).
May 9, 2007 21 Featured Case ORDER DENYING REMAINING PRELIMINARY INJUNCTIVE RELIEF. Plaintiff's 2 Motion for Preliminary Injunction is denied; and, upon oral motion of the Plaintiff, the individual capacity claims in the Amended Complaint against Defendants Baker Kurrus, Charles Armstrong, Melanie Fox, Dianne Curry, and Larry Berkley are dismissed. Signed by Judge G. Thomas Eisele on 05/9/2007. (thd)
May 8, 2007 20 MOTION to Amend/Correct 9 Brief in Opposition by Katherine P Mitchell, Robert M Daugherty (Cain, Terrence)
May 8, 2007 19 RESPONSE to Motion re 7 Supplemental MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction filed by Little Rock School District. (Madison, Richard)
May 8, 2007 18 ANSWER to Amended Complaint by Little Rock School District, Baker Kurrus, Charles Armstrong, Melanie Fox, Dianne Curry, Larry Berkley, Katherine P Mitchell, Robert M Daugherty.(Kitchens, Lloyd)
May 8, 2007 17 Featured Case LETTER ORDER regarding 2 Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction. Signed by Judge G. Thomas Eisele on 05/08/2007. (thd)
May 8, 2007 16 NOTICE of Appearance by Lloyd W. Kitchens, III on behalf of all defendants (Kitchens, Lloyd)
May 8, 2007 15 NOTICE of Appearance by Morgan E. Welch on behalf of all defendants (Welch, Morgan)
May 8, 2007 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Richard Christopher Madison on behalf of all defendants (Madison, Richard)
May 8, 2007 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Anthony Bryce Brewer on behalf of all defendants (Brewer, Anthony)
May 8, 2007 12 (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. (60)(a), the Court hereby enters a corrected copy of the original 10 Order solely to correct certain clerical errors and omissions made in haste of the preparation of yesterday's Order. Signed by Judge G. Thomas Eisele on 05/08/2007. (Copy of the corrected order attached.)(thd)
May 7, 2007 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Terrence Cain on behalf of Katherine P Mitchell, Robert M Daugherty (Cain, Terrence)
May 7, 2007 Summons Issued as to Baker Kurrus, Charles Armstrong, Melanie Fox, Dianne Curry, Larry Berkley, Katherine P Mitchell, Robert M Daugherty. (thd)
May 7, 2007 10 Featured Case ORDER GRANTING LIMITED INJUNCTIVE RELIEF. Plaintiff's 7 Supplemental Motion for Preliminary Injunction is granted on the limited terms set forth in this Order. Signed by Judge G. Thomas Eisele on 05/07/2007. (thd) (MODIFICATION: The corrected Order was substituted as an attachment on 5/8/2007 pursuant to 12 Court Order. (thd)
May 7, 2007 9 BRIEF IN OPPOSITION filed by Katherine P Mitchell, Robert M Daugherty re 7 Motion for TRO, 8 Response in Opposition to Motion, 2 Motion for TRO, (Cain, Terrence)
May 7, 2007 8 RESPONSE in Opposition re 7 Supplemental MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction, 2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction filed by Katherine P Mitchell, Robert M Daugherty. (Cain, Terrence)
May 6, 2007 7 Supplemental MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction by Roy G Brooks (Askew, Jess)
May 5, 2007 6 AMENDED COMPLAINT against all parties, filed by Roy G Brooks (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Stone, Clayborne)
May 4, 2007 EXHIBIT I (Videotaped copy of Radio Interview with Katherine Mitchell on 4/6/2007) to 2 Motion for TRO filed by Roy G Brooks; document received conventionally and maintained in the case file. (thd)
May 4, 2007 5 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Complaint and Summons, filed by Roy G Brooks. Katherine P Mitchell served on 5/1/2007. (Askew, Jess)
May 4, 2007 4 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Complaint and Summons, filed by Roy G Brooks. Robert M Daugherty served on 5/1/2007. (Askew, Jess)
May 4, 2007 3 BRIEF IN SUPPORT filed by Roy G Brooks re 2 Motion for TRO, Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction (Askew, Jess)
May 4, 2007 2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction by Roy G Brooks (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit B# 3 Exhibit C# 4 Exhibit D# 5 Exhibit E# 6 Exhibit F# 7 Exhibit G# 8 Exhibit H# 9 Exhibit I# 10 Exhibit J# 11 Exhibit K# 12 Exhibit L# 13 Exhibit M# 14 Exhibit N# 15 Exhibit O# 16 Exhibit P# 17 Exhibit Q# 18 Exhibit R# 19 Exhibit S)(Askew, Jess)
April 30, 2007 1 COMPLAINT filed by Roy G Brooks against all defendants; Summons issued and returned to attorney; Filing fee of 350.00 paid; Receipt #LIT005755. (kjp)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Brooks v. Mitchell et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Roy G Brooks
Represented By: Clayborne S. Stone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Katherine P Mitchell
Represented By: Morgan E. Welch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert M Daugherty
Represented By: Morgan E. Welch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Little Rock School District
Represented By: Morgan E. Welch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Baker Kurrus
Represented By: Morgan E. Welch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charles Armstrong
Represented By: Morgan E. Welch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Melanie Fox
Represented By: Morgan E. Welch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dianne Curry
Represented By: Morgan E. Welch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Larry Berkley
Represented By: Morgan E. Welch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?