Clark et al v. Baka et al

Plaintiff: Ronald Mark Clark and Margaret Clark
Defendant: John Baka, John V Baka M D PA, Saline County Medical Center, St Paul Mercury Insurance Company, Andrea Denise Hall, Patricia Lynn Dyer and Paula Renee Dyer
Case Number: 4:2007cv00477
Filed: May 3, 2007
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Little Rock Office
County: Out of State
Presiding Judge: Susan Webber Wright
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Med. Malpractice
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Medical Malpractice
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 14, 2011 500 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing the Clerk to tax $11,378.89 against the Clarks. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 9/14/11. (kpr)
July 19, 2011 498 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER finding as moot 485 Motion for Bill of Costs; denying 487 Motion for New Trial; granting in part and denying in part 490 Motion for Bill of Costs. The Clerk shall tax $11,378.89 against the Clarks, as outlined in this Order. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 7/19/11. (kpr)
February 8, 2011 471 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER allowing support personnel for the Defendants, Seth Creed, to bring his laptop computer and cell phone including smart phone, into the courthouse. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 2/8/2011. (mkf)
February 1, 2011 464 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER allowing support personnel for the Defendants, Sandra L. Baka to bring her laptop computer and cell phone including smart phone, into the courthouse. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 2/1/2011. (mkf)
January 31, 2011 460 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER allowing expert witnesses for Plaintiffs, Dr. Donald Null, Dr. Joseph Bruner, Dr. Robert Podosin, Dr. Thomas Naidich, Dr. Terrie Naramor, Karen Preston, and Ralph Scott to bring their laptop computers and cell phones including smart phones, into the courthouse. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 1/31/2011. (mkf)
January 28, 2011 451 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER allowing Plaintiffs' staff and support personnel, Mary Zelhof, Cheryl Welch, and Anna Johnson, to bring their laptop computers and cell phones including smart phones, into the courthouse for the trial in this matter beginning 31 January 2011. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 1/28/2011. (mkf)
January 21, 2011 431 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that the parties' Motions in Limine 379 380 381 383 , and 385 are GRANTED IN PART AND DENIED IN PART. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 1/21/11. (vjt)
January 13, 2011 421 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: Pursuant to General Order 54, Max Freeman and Daphne Grier are allowed to bring electronic equipment into the courthouse for the pretrial hearing scheduled for 19 January 2011 at 9:30 a.m.. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 1/13/2011. (mkf)
December 29, 2010 415 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 393 Motion for Consideration; denied as to supplemental questionnaire; granted as to enlarged panel; the Court will allow an enlarged panel of eighty potential jurors.Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 12/29/2010. (mkf)
September 4, 2009 360 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing the parties to file a written response by September 11, 2009 as to whether any action should be taken with regard to the stay.. Signed by Judge G. Thomas Eisele on 9/4/09. (mkf)
March 31, 2009 351 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT: In accordance with the Court's 345 Order dismissing with prejudice the claims against Separate Defendants Quorum Health Resources LLC and Hospital Management Professionals Inc. The Court's 2/12/09 345 Order is hereby amended to so reflect. Signed by Judge G. Thomas Eisele on 3/31/09. (hph)
December 15, 2008 270 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 256 Motion to Compel and directing defts to provide plaintiffs with the results of Dr. Asarnow's review of his computer calendar as soon as possible but not later than December 22, 2008. Signed by Judge G. Thomas Eisele on 12/15/08. (bkp)
November 10, 2008 253 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 238 Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel Inspection and Photographing of Saline Memorial Medical Center; and, amending the Court's scheduling order as stated herein. Signed by Judge G. Thomas Eisele on 11/10/2008. (thd)
October 9, 2008 225 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ON QUORUM-RELATED DISCOVERY MOTIONS granting in part and denying in part 161 Quorum Health Resource's Motion for Protective Order; denying 190 Plaintiffs' Motion for Emergency Hearing and Motion to Compel Quorum Court to Respond to Written Discovery; and, denying 163 Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel Continental Casualty Company's Responses to Requests for Production except as otherwise stated herein. Signed by Judge G. Thomas Eisele on 10/9/2008. (thd)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Clark et al v. Baka et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ronald Mark Clark
Represented By: Leslie Frank Weisbrod
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Margaret Clark
Represented By: Leslie Frank Weisbrod
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Baka
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John V Baka M D PA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Saline County Medical Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: St Paul Mercury Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrea Denise Hall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Patricia Lynn Dyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paula Renee Dyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?