Stevenson v. Union Pacific Railroad Company

Plaintiff: Robert Stevenson
Defendant: Union Pacific Railroad Company
Case Number: 4:2007cv00522
Filed: May 25, 2007
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Little Rock Office
County: Saline
Presiding Judge: J. Leon Holmes
Nature of Suit: Federal Employer's Liability
Cause of Action: 45:51 Railways: Fed. Employer's Liability Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 1, 2009 102 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DISMISSING CASE with prejudice based upon the joint motion of the parties. Signed by Judge Brian S. Miller on 5/1/09. (bkp)
March 16, 2009 99 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER authorizing certain electronic devices in the courtroom pursuant to General Order No. 54. Signed by Judge Brian S. Miller on 3/16/09. (bkp)
March 12, 2009 98 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 78 79 82 Motions in Limine, as set forth in this Order. Signed by Judge Brian S. Miller on 3/12/09. (bkp)
March 5, 2009 89 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 81 Motion to Dismiss Counts III and IV of the complaint without prejudice. Signed by Judge Brian S. Miller on 3/5/09. (bkp)
January 20, 2009 70 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER finding as moot 44 Motion to Compel; granting 52 Motion to Dismiss and dismissing deft Seats as a third-party deft; and finding as moot 54 Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge Brian S. Miller on 1/20/09. (bkp)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Stevenson v. Union Pacific Railroad Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Stevenson
Represented By: Nelson Gregory Wolff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Union Pacific Railroad Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?