Loftin v. United Parcel Service Inc.

Plaintiff: Kim D Loftin
Defendant: United Parcel Service Inc.
Case Number: 4:2007cv00564
Filed: June 11, 2007
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Little Rock Office
County: Arkansas
Presiding Judge: J. Leon Holmes
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:12111 American Disability Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 5, 2009 72 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT: In accordance with the 70 Stipulation of Dismissal filed by the Plaintiff and the 71 Order of Dismissal entered by the Court the 5th day of March, 2009, Judgment is entered and this case is dismissed with prejudice. Signed at the Direction of the Court on 3/5/09. (hph) (Docket text modified on 3/5/2009 to correct the signer.) (thd)
January 15, 2009 57 Opinion or Order of the Court AMENDED MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER re 53 Order on Motion for Summary Judgment; 34 UPS's MOTION for Summary Judgment on Loftin's retaliation claim under the ADA is GRANTED. Signed by Judge Rodney S. Webb on 1/15/09. (mkf)
January 5, 2009 53 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 34 Motion for Summary Judgment; DENIED as to Loftin's state law claims regarding age discrimination and FMLA-related discriminated; GRANTED as to Loftin's ADA and related state law claims. Signed by Judge Rodney S. Webb on 1/5/09. (mkf)
November 14, 2008 49 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 42 Motion for Default Judgment. Signed by Judge Rodney S. Webb on 11/14/08. (bkp) (The docket text was modified on 11/18/2008 to correct the description of the document filed; linkage corrected.) (thd)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Loftin v. United Parcel Service Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kim D Loftin
Represented By: James H. Penick, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United Parcel Service Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?