Honarmand v. J C Penney et al

Plaintiff: Alan Honarmand
Defendant: J C Penney and Tiffany Jones
Case Number: 4:2007cv00680
Filed: August 9, 2007
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Little Rock Office
County: Pulaski
Presiding Judge: James M Moody
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
February 23, 2011 180 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 172 Motion for Reconsideration. The dismissal of this action, with prejudice, entered January 11, 2011 remains in effect, and the Clerk is directed to close the case. Signed by Judge James M. Moody on 2/23/11. (kpr)
January 11, 2011 170 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DISMISSING CASE with prejudice pursuant to a settlement reached by the parties. Signed by Judge James M. Moody on 1/11/11. (bkp)
January 4, 2011 156 Opinion or Order of the Court PROTECTIVE ORDER regarding confidential information. Signed by Judge James M. Moody on 1/4/11. (vjt)
July 7, 2010 126 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 105 Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge James M. Moody on 7/7/10. (bkp)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Honarmand v. J C Penney et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alan Honarmand
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J C Penney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tiffany Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?