Nnaji v. USA

Plaintiff: Nicholas Nnaji
Defendant: USA
Case Number: 4:2007cv00937
Filed: October 5, 2007
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Little Rock Office
County: Out of State
Presiding Judge: J. Leon Holmes
Referring Judge: H. David Young
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 8, 2009 119 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 117 Motion for Reconsideration re 110 Order Adopting Report and Recommendations, 111 Judgment. Signed by Judge Brian S. Miller on 6/8/09. (mkf)
April 17, 2009 111 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT re 110 Order Adopting Report and Recommendations and dismissing complaint with prejudice. Signed by Judge Brian S. Miller on 4/17/09. (bkp)
March 17, 2009 98 Opinion or Order of the Court PROPOSED FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS that Pltf's complaint 2 8 be DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE; Objections to R&R due by 3/31/2009. Signed by Magistrate Judge H. David Young on 3/17/09. (vjt)
October 22, 2008 55 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying request for reconsideration 54 . Signed by Judge Brian S. Miller on 10/22/08. (bkp)
September 8, 2008 43 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER adopting in part 33 Report and Recommendations; granting in part and denying in part 22 Motion to Dismiss/Summary Judgment; Pltf's complaint is DISMISSED with prejudice with respect to his FTCA claims; Pltf's Bivens claims against defendants J. Huff, J. Dube-Gilley, M. Danaher, and H. Thornton, in their official capacities, and the United States are DISMISSED; pltf's Bivens claims against defendants Huff, Dube-Gilley, Danaher, and Thornton, in their individual capacities, will proceed. Signed by Judge Brian S. Miller on 9/08/08. (mkf)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Nnaji v. USA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nicholas Nnaji
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: USA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?