Bridges v. Omega World Travel II Inc et al

Plaintiff: James Bridges
Defendant: Omega World Travel II Inc
Movant: USA
Case Number: 4:2007cv01060
Filed: December 18, 2009
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Little Rock Office
Presiding Judge: Brian S. Miller
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 31:3729 False Claims Act

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 13, 2010 73 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 68 Stipulation of Dismissal filed by James Bridges dismissing this action without prejudice as to the United States and with prejudice as to all other parties. Signed by Judge Brian S. Miller on 9/13/10. (bkp)
April 2, 2010 65 Opinion or Order of the Court PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Judge Brian S. Miller on 4/2/10. (bkp)
December 18, 2009 54 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 33 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Brian S. Miller on 12/18/09. (bkp)
May 19, 2009 29 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 25 Motion for Leave to Appear pro hac vice of Bryant S. Banes for deft. Signed by Judge Brian S. Miller on 5/19/09. (bkp)
May 11, 2009 23 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting request contained in 22 Letter and extending the time for Omega World Travel II, Inc. to respond to the amended complaint until May 27, 2009. Signed DOC by Dennis J. Wysocki, Chief Deputy of Operations, on 5/11/09. (bkp)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bridges v. Omega World Travel II Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Bridges
Represented By: Charles F. Barrett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Omega World Travel II Inc
Represented By: Bryant S. Banes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Movant: USA
Represented By: Arnold M. Auerhan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?