Gee v. Chambers et al

Plaintiff: Kirk Gee
Defendant: L Chambers, Bobby Brown, Porter and C Oliver
Case Number: 4:2007cv01144
Filed: November 27, 2007
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Little Rock Office
County: Faulkner
Presiding Judge: J. Leon Holmes
Referring Judge: H. David Young
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 8, 2009 63 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER adopting 61 Recommended Disposition in its entirety; therefore, Defts' 53 Motion for Summary Judgment is GRANTED, and Pltf's claims are dismissed with prejudice; judgment will be entered accordingly. Signed by Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes on 6/8/09. (vjt)
May 22, 2009 61 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS that defts' motion for summary judgment be granted and pltf's claims be dismissed with prejudice 53 . The Court certify, pursuant to 28 USC 1915(a)(3), that an ifp appeal from any order adopting these recommendations would not be taken in good faith. Objections to R&R due by 6/5/2009. Signed by Magistrate Judge H. David Young on 5/22/2009. (lej)
January 16, 2009 39 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing the Clerk of the Court to prepare summons for deft L. Chambers at the address provided to the Clerk and kept under seal and the Marshal to serve a copy of the complaint, amended complaints, this order and summons on deft Chambers without prepayment of costs therefor. Signed by Magistrate Judge H. David Young on 1/16/09. (bkp)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gee v. Chambers et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kirk Gee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: L Chambers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bobby Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Porter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C Oliver
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?