Maida et al v. Sherman et al

Plaintiff: Dominick Maida, Dorothy Marie Maida and Maida Inc
Defendant: Samantha Sherman, Joe Vincent, II, James Sherman, Jerry Johnson, TheVisionGrp Inc and VGRT Inc
Case Number: 4:2007cv01151
Filed: November 29, 2007
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Little Rock Office
County: Saline
Presiding Judge: James M Moody
Nature of Suit: Racketeer/Corrupt Organization
Cause of Action: 18:1964 Racketeering (RICO) Act
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 1, 2010 120 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that Arkansas Blue Cross and Blue Shield release to Jensen Young and Houston, PLLC, as attorneys for plaintiff/judgment creditors, those amounts subject to garnishment. Signed by Judge Brian S. Miller on 4/1/10. (bkp)
January 6, 2010 115 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing Wal-Mart Stores, Inc. to release amounts set forth in this Order to Jensen Young and Houston PLLC for as long as the defendant is employed by Garnishee, pending receipt of a Satisfaction of Judgment or further Order terminating this Order of Garnishment. Signed by Judge Brian S. Miller on 1/6/10. (bkp)
October 2, 2009 110 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying without prejudice 108 Motion for Bill of Costs; granting 108 Motion for Attorney Fees by awarding a fee in the amount of $28,000.00. Signed by Judge Brian S. Miller on 10/2/09. (mkf)
August 13, 2009 105 Opinion or Order of the Court AMENDED JUDGMENT 103 . Signed by Judge Brian S. Miller on 8/13/09. (bkp)
August 11, 2009 103 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT re 102 Order granting Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge Brian S. Miller on 8/11/09. (bkp)
June 22, 2009 76 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 70 Motion for Reconsideration re 68 Order. Signed by Judge Brian S. Miller on 6/22/09. (bkp)
May 29, 2009 68 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 64 Motion for Discovery Sanctions to the extent set forth in this Order. Signed by Judge Brian S. Miller on 5/29/09. (bkp)
November 25, 2008 52 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 41 Motion for Discovery; denying 41 Motion for Sanctions; granting 43 Motion to Take Deposition from Joe Vincent, II. Signed by Judge Brian S. Miller on 11/25/08. (bkp)
November 19, 2008 50 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 37 Motion for Contempt and for Sanctions 37 to the extent set forth in this Order. Signed by Judge Brian S. Miller on 11/19/08. (bkp)
November 18, 2008 48 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER striking the answers of James Sherman, Joe Vincent II, the Vision Group, Inc. and VGRT 12 11 ; these defts to have twenty days from the date of this Order to file an answer. Signed by Judge Brian S. Miller on 11/18/08. (bkp)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Maida et al v. Sherman et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dominick Maida
Represented By: Perry Y. Young
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dorothy Marie Maida
Represented By: Perry Y. Young
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maida Inc
Represented By: Perry Y. Young
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Samantha Sherman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joe Vincent, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Sherman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jerry Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TheVisionGrp Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: VGRT Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?