Bale Chevrolet Company v. USA

Plaintiff: Bale Chevrolet Company
Defendant: USA
Case Number: 4:2008cv00056
Filed: January 22, 2008
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Little Rock Office
County: Pulaski
Presiding Judge: J. Leon Holmes
Nature of Suit: Taxes
Cause of Action: 28:1346 Recovery of IRS Tax
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 5, 2010 41 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 37 Bale's Motion to Supplement the Record. Signed by Judge Brian S. Miller on 4/5/10. (vjt)
September 4, 2009 30 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 20 Motion for Attorney Fees. Signed by Judge Brian S. Miller on 9/4/09. (mkf)
December 1, 2008 18 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DISMISSING CASE and vacating the December 15, 2008 trial date and directing plaintiff to submit an attorney's fee application by January 20, 2009. Signed by Judge Brian S. Miller on 12/1/08. (bkp)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bale Chevrolet Company v. USA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bale Chevrolet Company
Represented By: Eugene G. Sayre
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: USA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?