Hogan v. BG Excelsior Limited Partnership

Plaintiff: Juanita Hogan
Defendant: BG Excelsior Limited Partnership
Case Number: 4:2008cv00122
Filed: February 7, 2008
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Little Rock Office
County: Saline
Presiding Judge: William R. Wilson
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441 Petition for Removal - Employment Discrimination
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 14, 2009 46 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DISMISSING CASE with prejudice by Reason of Settlement. Signed by Judge William R. Wilson, Jr on 5/14/09. (bkp)
April 16, 2009 30 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 19 Motion for Summary Judgment, trial to commence at 9:00 a.m., Tuesday, May 19, 2009. Signed by Judge William R. Wilson, Jr on 4/16/09. (bkp)
February 5, 2009 15 Opinion or Order of the Court AGREED PROTECTIVE ORDER regarding discovery requests in this case. Signed by Judge William R. Wilson, Jr on 2/5/09. (mkf)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hogan v. BG Excelsior Limited Partnership
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Juanita Hogan
Represented By: Paul Gerard Pfeifer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BG Excelsior Limited Partnership
Represented By: Marcus M. Crider
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?