GeoVera Specialty Insurance Company v. Graham Rogers Inc et al

Plaintiff: Geovera Specialty Insurance Company
Defendant: Graham Rogers Inc, East Central Arkansas Insurance Inc and Jerry Reeves
Case Number: 4:2008cv00163
Filed: February 22, 2008
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Little Rock Office
County: Arkansas
Presiding Judge: Susan Webber Wright
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Property Damage
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
November 15, 2012 218 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT consistent with Orders 187 215 , and 217 , is hereby entered in favor of pltf GeoVera Specialty Insurance Company against separate deft Graham Rogers in the principal amount of $765,708.34, together with pre-judgment interest of $269,278 and post-judgment interest from the date of this judgment until paid at the rate of.19% per annum as provided by law. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 11/15/12. (vjt)
September 6, 2012 211 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 201 Motion for Summary Judgment; finding as moot 208 Motion to Clarify. The deft, Graham Rogers, Inc., is directed to file a status report within 10 days from the entry date of this order stating the status of its crossclaims against East Central Arkansas Insurance, Inc. and Jerry Reaves. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 9/6/12. (kpr)
March 20, 2012 198 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying deft's 188 Motion for Reconsideration; denying pltf's 193 Motion for Judgment; the Court will enter a final scheduling order setting the remaining claims for trial. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 3/20/12. (vjt)
January 30, 2012 187 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying defts' 165 Motion for Summary Judgment; granting pltf's 168 Motion for Summary Judgment; the parties are directed to file briefs within 20 days of the entry of this Order, on the issue of whether Graham Rogers is entitled to offset; unless the parties request otherwise, the Court will enter a final scheduling order re the remaining claims in this case. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 1/30/12. (vjt)
June 28, 2011 161 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting pltf's 157 Motion to Vacate the August 23, 2010 Order awarding attorney's fees and costs to Grahman Rogers 136 ; the Court will set a new trial date and pretrial deadlines in a separate scheduling order regarding the pending claims. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 6/28/11. (vjt)
June 6, 2011 154 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER advising deft Graham Rogers Inc that, if it disagrees with the Court's understanding regarding the status of said cross-claims and third-party claim, it has up to and including 7 days from the entry of this Order to file a brief stating its position. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 6/6/11. (vjt)
September 22, 2010 141 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 138 Motion to Stay enforcement of the order granting attorney fees and costs contingent upon the posting of a $40,000 bond. Plaintiff shall have fifteen (15) days from the date of this Order to file said supersedeas bond, and upon filing of the bond, a stay will be entered. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 9/22/10. (dac)
August 23, 2010 136 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part 121 Motion for Attorney Fees. Defendant Graham Rogers, Inc. is hereby awarded $39,794.50 in attorneys fees and $198.80 in costs. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 8/23/10. (dac)
July 22, 2010 132 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 121 MOTION for Attorney Fees and Costs (Renewed) filed by Graham Rogers Inc: Court grants Graham Rogers 10 days in which to submit the documentation set forth in this Order; and grants GeoVera Specialty Insurance Company up to and including 10 days following Graham Rogers' submission in which to file a supplemental response. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 7/22/10. (bkp)
April 2, 2010 119 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT pursuant to the Court's previous Orders 32 53 98 and the Order of Dismissal 118 entered this date, judgment is hereby entered DISMISSING THIS ACTION IN ITS ENTIRETY. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 4/2/10. (vjt)
August 28, 2009 109 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 103 Motion for Reconsideration re 98 Order on Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 8/28/09. (bkp)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: GeoVera Specialty Insurance Company v. Graham Rogers Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Geovera Specialty Insurance Company
Represented By: Kevin A. Crass
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Graham Rogers Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: East Central Arkansas Insurance Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jerry Reeves
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?