Stogsdill et al v. Elkins et al

Plaintiff: Jennifer Stogsdill and Wayne Stogsdill
Defendant: John S Elkins, Arkadelphia Women's Clinic P A and Juan J Roman
Case Number: 4:2008cv00207
Filed: March 17, 2008
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Little Rock Office
County: Out of State
Presiding Judge: James M. Moody
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Med. Malpractice
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Medical Malpractice
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 1, 2010 200 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT re 199 Jury Verdict in favor of defendant. Signed by Judge James M. Moody on 10/1/10. (bkp)
September 27, 2010 196 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 188 MOTION for Order to Take Judicial Notice of Adjudicated Fact filed by Juan J Roman: The Court granted in part and denied in part this motion during a pretrial hearing and will advise the jury there is no claim for damages being made for Taylor Stogsdill. Signed by Judge James M. Moody on 9/27/10. (bkp)
September 24, 2010 191 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 155 Motion in Limine. Signed by Judge James M. Moody on 9/24/10. (bkp)
September 22, 2010 187 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 152 Motion in Limine; denying 153 Motion in Limine; denying 157 Motion in Limine; granting 159 Motion in Limine; granting 161 Motion in Limine; granting 163 Motion in Limine; granting 165 Motion for Leave to File; denying 167 Motion in Limine; granting in part and denying in part 169 Motion in Limine. Signed by Judge James M. Moody on 9/22/10. (bkp)
October 27, 2009 124 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT in favor of defts re 117 Jury Verdict. Signed by Judge James M. Moody on 10/27/09. (bkp)
October 16, 2009 114 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 48 Motion in Limine; denying 63 Motion in Limine; holding in abeyance 67 Motion in Limine; granting in part and denying in part 81 Motion in Limine; denying 82 Motion in Limine; granting in part and denying in part 86 Motion for Joinder; granting in part and denying in part 106 Motion in Limine; granting in part and denying in part 111 Motion in Limine. Signed by Judge James M. Moody on 10/16/09. (bkp)
October 14, 2009 99 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 42 Motion in Limine re Dr. Piver; granting in part and denying in part defts' 50 Motion in Limine re Dr. Piver; and granting in part and denying in part defts' 52 Motion in Limine re Dr. Taylor. Signed by Judge James M. Moody on 10/14/09. (bkp)
October 5, 2009 54 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 35 Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge James M. Moody on 10/5/09. (bkp)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Stogsdill et al v. Elkins et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jennifer Stogsdill
Represented By: David Anthony Szwak
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wayne Stogsdill
Represented By: David Anthony Szwak
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John S Elkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arkadelphia Women's Clinic P A
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Juan J Roman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?