Jones v. Rodgers et al

Plaintiff: Mychael Jones
Defendant: Marquis Rodgers and Dart Transit Company
Case Number: 4:2008cv00225
Filed: March 21, 2008
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Motor Vehicle Office
County: Pulaski
Presiding Judge: James M. Moody
Nature of Suit: Both
Cause of Action: Diversity
Jury Demanded By: 28:1332 Diversity-Tort/Motor Vehicle (P.I.)

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 17, 2009 78 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DISMISSING CASE with prejudice pursuant to a settlement reached by the parties. Signed by Judge James M. Moody on 6/17/09. (bkp)
June 8, 2009 75 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 70 Motion in Limine. Signed by Judge James M. Moody on 6/8/09. (mkf)
April 23, 2009 63 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER finding as moot Motions in Limine; 51 53 55 57 59 61 . Signed by Judge James M. Moody on 4/23/09. (bkp)
November 19, 2008 21 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 16 Motion to Compel. Signed by Judge James M. Moody on 11/19/08. (bkp)
October 28, 2008 20 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 12 Motion to Compel. Signed by Judge James M. Moody on 10/28/08. (bkp)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jones v. Rodgers et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mychael Jones
Represented By: Phyllis B. Eddins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marquis Rodgers
Represented By: Scott Michael Strauss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dart Transit Company
Represented By: Scott Michael Strauss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?