Chism et al v. Ethicon Endo-Surgery Inc et al

Plaintiff: Sharon Chism and Cecil Chism
Defendant: Ethicon Endo-Surgery Inc and John Does
Case Number: 4:2008cv00341
Filed: April 17, 2008
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability Office
County: Pulaski
Presiding Judge: William R. Wilson
Nature of Suit: Both
Cause of Action: Diversity
Jury Demanded By: 28:1441 Petition for Removal- Personal Injury

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 8, 2009 85 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT in favor of Ethicon Endo-Surgery Inc against Sharon Chism re 82 Jury Verdict. Signed by Judge William R. Wilson, Jr on 10/8/09. (mkf)
September 29, 2009 74 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 65 Waiver authorizing Janis M. Kovalscik, Kristi Geier and Timothy R. Lovich to bring into the Courthouse electronic devices beginning Monday, October 5, 2009 through Friday, October 9, 2009. Signed by Judge William R. Wilson, Jr on 9/29/09. (bkp)
September 25, 2009 66 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 40 Motion in Limine. Signed by Judge William R. Wilson, Jr on 9/25/09. (bkp)
September 23, 2009 62 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 35 38 Motions in Limine. Signed by Judge William R. Wilson, Jr on 9/23/09. (mkf)
August 27, 2009 37 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 24 Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge William R. Wilson, Jr on 8/27/09. (bkp)
May 7, 2009 23 Opinion or Order of the Court CONSENT CONFIDENTIALITY ORDER regarding certain discovery material. Signed by Judge William R. Wilson, Jr on 5/7/09. (mkf)
February 13, 2009 13 Opinion or Order of the Court LETTER ORDER providing a new form to be used to draft a new Protective Order. Signed by Judge William R. Wilson, Jr on 2/13/09. (mkf)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Chism et al v. Ethicon Endo-Surgery Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sharon Chism
Represented By: Donald S. Ryan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cecil Chism
Represented By: Donald S. Ryan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ethicon Endo-Surgery Inc
Represented By: G. Spence Fricke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?