Bay Machinery Services Inc v. W K Webster (Overseas) Ltd et al

Plaintiff: Bay Machinery Services Inc
Defendant: W K Webster (Overseas) Ltd, Vestas American Wind Technology Inc and Vesta Wind Systems A S
Case Number: 4:2008cv00368
Filed: April 29, 2008
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Contract: Other Office
County: Out of State
Presiding Judge: Susan Webber Wright
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 49:81 Damaged Goods While Being Transported

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 14, 2011 125 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER pursuant to 124 Stipulation of Dismissal filed by the parties, that was entered on May 16, 2011, this consolidated action is hereby dismissed. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 6/14/11. (vjt)
March 18, 2011 123 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that the time for Bay Machinery and ATS Logistics to file a response to 121 MOTION to Fix the Amount of Prejudgment Interest Recoverable on the Principal Amount Awarded filed by Codan Forsikring A/S is hereby extended to and including 3/28/11. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 3/18/11. (vjt)
January 13, 2011 108 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying Codan's 66 and 69 Motions for Partial Summary Judgment; denying pltf's 70 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment; denying 74 Motion of ATS for Summary Judgment; denying 101 Motion of ATS to Reopen Discovery and for Continuance; 106 Motion in Limine of ATS is denied as moot. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 1/13/11. (vjt)
January 4, 2011 100 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER extending time to 1/10/11 for filing the Stipulation of Agreed Facts, Trial Briefs, and Proposed Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 1/4/11. (vjt)
December 10, 2010 96 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER, the parties may disregard the provision in the Final Scheduling Order 52 that urges the parties to include in their trial briefs and proposed Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law electronic links to citations. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 12/10/10. (vjt)
July 17, 2009 45 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER; the Court will issue an Initial Scheduling Order in due course to be followed by a Final Scheduling Order. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 7/17/09. (mkf)
July 10, 2009 43 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER consolidating this case with 4:09-cv-00246 SWW; the Initial and Final Scheduling Orders (as amended) (doc.#'s 13,16) are hereby vacated; the Court will issue a new Scheduling Order for the now consolidated action in due course. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 7/10/09. (mkf)
April 23, 2009 36 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 34 Motion to Compel; Codan Forsikring is directed to respond to Bay Machinery's Interrogatories and Request for Production of Documents w/i ten days of the date of entry of this Order; failure to comply with this Order will result in sanctions. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 4/23/09. (mkf)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bay Machinery Services Inc v. W K Webster (Overseas) Ltd et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bay Machinery Services Inc
Represented By: Kara B. Mikles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: W K Webster (Overseas) Ltd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vestas American Wind Technology Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vesta Wind Systems A S
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?