Kielty v. Wyeth et al

Plaintiff: Cheryl Kielty
Defendant: Wyeth, Wyeth Pharmaceuticals, Pfizer Inc, Pharmacia & Upjohn Company LLC, Pharmacia Corporation, Pharmacia & Upjohn LLC, Greenstone Ltd, Barr Laboratories Inc, Barr Pharmaceuticals Inc and Duramed Pharmaceuticals Inc
Case Number: 4:2008cv00402
Filed: May 7, 2008
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability Office
County: Out of State
Referring Judge: Henry L. Jones
Presiding Judge: William R. Wilson
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: Diversity
Jury Demanded By: 28:1332 Diversity-Personal Injury-Product Liability

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 6, 2013 35 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing Plaintiff to provide any additional evidentiary support for claims against generic manufacturers by 5 p.m., Monday, May 20, 2013. Signed by Judge Billy Roy Wilson on 05/06/2013. (jak)
April 1, 2013 32 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing Plaintiff(s) to file FDA correspondence and, if needed, an Addendum to the Amended Complaint by 5:00 p.m. on 4/8/2013. Signed by Judge Billy Roy Wilson on 04/01/2013. (jak) (Docket text modified on 4/1/2013 to remove duplicate text.) (thd).
September 11, 2012 24 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying without prejudice Defendants' Motions for Judgment on the Pleadings. Plaintiffs are permitted to amend their individual complaints within 3 weeks of the date of this Order. Signed by Judge Billy Roy Wilson on 9/11/12. (kpr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kielty v. Wyeth et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wyeth
Represented By: Carrie L Hund
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wyeth Pharmaceuticals
Represented By: Carrie L Hund
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pfizer Inc
Represented By: David Powell Graham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pharmacia & Upjohn Company LLC
Represented By: David Powell Graham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pharmacia Corporation
Represented By: David Powell Graham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pharmacia & Upjohn LLC
Represented By: David Powell Graham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Greenstone Ltd
Represented By: David Powell Graham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Barr Laboratories Inc
Represented By: Jan McLean Bernier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Barr Pharmaceuticals Inc
Represented By: Jan McLean Bernier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Duramed Pharmaceuticals Inc
Represented By: Jan McLean Bernier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cheryl Kielty
Represented By: Ted Gordon Meadows
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?