Liu et al v. Mehlin et al

Plaintiff: Tie-Lei Liu and Xiao-Dong Chen
Defendant: Becca Mehlin, Little Rock Gynecology Associates Inc and Karen J Kozlowski
Case Number: 4:2008cv00415
Filed: May 8, 2008
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Personal Inj. Med. Malpractice Office
County: Out of State
Presiding Judge: James M. Moody
Nature of Suit: Defendant
Cause of Action: Diversity
Jury Demanded By: 28:1332 Diversity-Medical Malpractice

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 8, 2009 56 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT re 54 Jury Verdict in favor of plaintiff Tie-Lei Liu in the sum of $369,906.11, in favor of plaintiff Xiao-Dong Chen, M.D., the sum of $10,000.00 together with interest at the rate of.50% per annum; plaintiffs to take nothing on their complaint against deft Karen J. Kozlowski, M.D.. Signed by Judge James M. Moody on 5/8/09. (bkp)
April 28, 2009 41 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 19 Motion in Limine; granting 25 Motion in Limine. Signed by Judge James M. Moody on 4/28/09. (bkp)
March 20, 2009 14 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER withdrawing 12 Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge for Settlement Conference. Signed at the Direction of the Court on 3/20/09. (bkp) (Docket text modified on 3/23/2009 to correct the signer.)(thd)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Liu et al v. Mehlin et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tie-Lei Liu
Represented By: Phillip H. McMath
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Xiao-Dong Chen
Represented By: Phillip H. McMath
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Becca Mehlin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Little Rock Gynecology Associates Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Karen J Kozlowski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?