Allen v. Winters et al

Plaintiff: David Wyne Allen
Defendant: Jay Winters, Earn Duvball, Rodger Martan and David Gibbons
Case Number: 4:2008cv00521
Filed: June 13, 2008
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Prison Condition: Civil Rights Office
County: Jackson
Presiding Judge: Brian S. Miller
Referring Judge: J. Thomas Ray
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 20, 2009 56 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing that Discovery is due by 11/18/2009, Motions are due by 12/18/2009. Signed by Magistrate Judge J. Thomas Ray on 8/20/09. (bkp)
June 25, 2009 44 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Adopting 41 Partial Report and Recommendations; pltf shall proceed with his inadequate medical care claim against Defendant Winters and his pendent state slander claim against Defendant Martan; all other claims and defendants are dismissed, w ith prejudice, for failing to state a claim upon which relief may be granted; the Court certifies, pursuant to 28 USC 1915(a)(3), that an ifp appeal of this Order would not be taken in good faith; the Clerk is directed to prepare summons for Defendants Winters and Martan, and the U.S. Marshal is directed to serve the summons, Complaint, and this Order on them without prepayment of fees and costs or security therefor. Signed by Judge Brian S. Miller on 6/25/09. (mkf)
April 27, 2009 34 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 31 Partial Report and Recommendations granting 23 Motion for Relief filed by David Wyne Allen and vacating the September 8, 2008 Order of Dismissal and Judgment. Signed by Judge Brian S. Miller on 4/27/09. (bkp)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Allen v. Winters et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jay Winters
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Earn Duvball
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rodger Martan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Gibbons
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Wyne Allen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?