Stribling v. Arkansas State Hospital

Plaintiff: Elinda J Stribling
Defendant: Arkansas State Hospital
Case Number: 4:2008cv00596
Filed: July 11, 2008
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Civil Rights: Jobs Office
County: Pulaski
Presiding Judge: James M. Moody
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 42:2000e Job Discrimination (Employment)

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 2, 2011 135 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 134 Motion for Reconsideration re 131 Order Dismissing Case and 132 Judgment for the reasons set forth in the Court's Order entered February 2, 2011. Signed by Judge James M. Moody on 3/2/11. (kpr)
February 2, 2011 132 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT re 131 Order Dismissing Case. Signed by Judge James M. Moody on 2/2/11. (bkp)
October 13, 2010 115 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 110 Motion to Compel and directing plaintiff to provide full and complete responses to the outstanding discovery requests on or before October 27, 2010; cancelling the deposition of plaintiff scheduled for October 15, 2010; relievin g appointed counsel Gregory D. Taylor and directing Mr. Taylor to provide plaintiff with a copy of her file by certified mail and to notify the Court of compliance; directing the Clerk to update the docket to reflect plaintiff as being pro se and to show her address; and to send a copy of this Order by regular and certified mail and to file the certified mail receipt demonstrating the certified mail's delivery, or lack thereof. Signed by Judge James M. Moody on 10/13/10. (bkp)
August 17, 2010 106 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying pltf's pro se 101 Motion for Appointment of New Counsel, for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery, and for New Trial Date and Scheduling Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerry W. Cavaneau on 8/17/10. (vjt)
August 4, 2010 103 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing pltf's appointed counsel to file a response, on or before 8/11/10, to pltf's pro se motion for appointment of new counsel and other relief 101 . Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerry W. Cavaneau on 8/4/10. (vjt)
March 1, 2010 87 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re bench trial scheduled for March 8, 2010 at 9:15 a.m., Courtroom 4A of the Richard Sheppard Arnold U.S. Courthouse. Counsel are to be present no later than 8:45 a.m. Counsel should fax or e-mail the trial witness list and exhibit list no la ter than Thursday, March 4, 2010; plaintiff's counsel is directed to file the trial brief and findings of fact and conclusions of law no later than Tuesday, March 2, 2010; and authorizing Gregory Taylor and James Brader, Jr. to bring electronic devices to this proceeding and each day the trial continues. Signed by Judge James M. Moody on 3/1/10. (bkp)
January 20, 2010 78 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 63 Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge James M. Moody on 1/20/10. (bkp)
September 21, 2009 72 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER canceling the bench trial currently scheduled for September 28, 2009; and directing plaintiff to file a response to defendant's motion for summary judgment no later than October 21, 2009. Signed by Judge James M. Moody on 9/21/09. (bkp)
December 11, 2008 34 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 24 deft's Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge James M. Moody on 12/11/08. (bkp)
September 19, 2008 26 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing the Plaintiff to file a response to 24 Defendant's MOTION to Dismiss no later than 10/2/08. Plaintiff is advised of responsibility to be familiar and comply with all Federal Rules of Civil Procedure as well as the Local Rules of the Court. Signed At The Direction of the Court by D. Jackson on 9/19/08. (jct)
September 9, 2008 21 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying without prejudice 10 Defendant's Motion to Dismiss; granting 20 Plaintiff's Motion to Amend. Plaintiff may file her amended complaint within 5 days of the entry of this Order. Signed by Judge James M. Moody on 9/9/08. (jct)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Stribling v. Arkansas State Hospital
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elinda J Stribling
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arkansas State Hospital
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?