Aylor v. Bryant School District No 25

Plaintiff: Walter Aylor
Defendant: Bryant School District No 25
Case Number: 4:2008cv00620
Filed: July 18, 2008
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Employment Office
County: Saline
Presiding Judge: Brian S. Miller
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 42:12101 American Disability Act for Handicapped

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
January 11, 2010 34 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 32 Motion for Bill of Costs and directing plaintiff Walter Aylor to pay the District's costs in the amount of $542.70. Signed by Judge Brian S. Miller on 1/11/10. (bkp)
November 30, 2009 31 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT in favor of Bryant School District No 25 against Walter Aylor re 30 Order on Motion for Summary Judgment dismissing case with prejudice. Signed by Judge Brian S. Miller on 11/30/09. (bkp)
November 24, 2009 30 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 16 Motion for Summary Judgment and dismissing plaintiff's claims with prejudice. Signed by Judge Brian S. Miller on 11/24/09. (bkp)
March 30, 2009 13 Opinion or Order of the Court CONSENT PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Judge Brian S. Miller on 3/30/09. (bkp)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Aylor v. Bryant School District No 25
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Walter Aylor
Represented By: John Mark White
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bryant School District No 25
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?