Outdoor Sportsman Group LLC v. EST LLC

Plaintiff: Outdoor Sportsman Group LLC
Defendant: EST LLC
Case Number: 4:2008cv00621
Filed: July 18, 2008
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Contract: Other Office
County: Pulaski
Presiding Judge: Brian S. Miller
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: Diversity
Jury Demanded By: 28:1332 Diversity-Contract Dispute

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 24, 2010 106 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying EST's 64 85 Motion for Summary Judgment; finding as moot EST's 76 Motion to Strike; and denying OSG's 89 Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge Brian S. Miller on 9/24/10. (bkp)
December 9, 2009 73 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 58 Motion to Compel as set forth in this Order. Signed by Judge Brian S. Miller on 12/9/09. (bkp)
May 20, 2009 55 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 8 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction. Signed by Judge Brian S. Miller on 5/20/09. (bkp)
March 4, 2009 50 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 29 Motion for Contempt. Signed by Judge Brian S. Miller on 3/4/09. (bkp)
January 30, 2009 37 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 33 Motion to Quash. Signed by Judge Brian S. Miller on 1/30/09. (bkp)
January 21, 2009 28 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 22 Motion for Contempt. Signed by Judge Brian S. Miller on 1/21/09. (bkp)
December 5, 2008 21 Opinion or Order of the Court PROTECTIVE ORDER governing the production of confidential information to the parties. Signed by Judge Brian S. Miller on 12/5/2008. (thd)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Outdoor Sportsman Group LLC v. EST LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Outdoor Sportsman Group LLC
Represented By: Paul J. James
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EST LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?