Porter v. Hartford Life & Accident Insurance Company

Plaintiff: Robert Porter
Defendant: Hartford Life & Accident Insurance Company
Case Number: 4:2008cv00637
Filed: July 28, 2008
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Labor: E.R.I.S.A. Office
County: Pulaski
Presiding Judge: William R. Wilson
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 29:1001 E.R.I.S.A.: Employee Retirement

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 8, 2009 78 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 77 Motion to Release Supersedeas Bond. Signed by Judge William R. Wilson, Jr on 9/8/09. (bkp)
August 31, 2009 76 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 71 Motion to Vacate and withdrawing and vacating the 44 45 Order and Judgment entered on April 23, 2009, and the Order 63 entered on July 2, 2009. Signed by Judge William R. Wilson, Jr on 8/31/09. (bkp)
July 2, 2009 63 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 46 Motion for Attorney Fees and Costs. Porter is awarded fees totaling $57,447.75 ($15,993.75 for Mark, plus $32,580.00 for the Law Firm, plus $8,527.50 for the law clerks, plus $346.50 for the paralegals) and non-taxable costs in the amount of $406.20. The portion of his motion seeking an award of prejudgment interest is granted. The parties shall attempt to agree to an appropriate amount of prejudgment interest. Signed by Magistrate Judge H. David Young on 7/2/09. (dac)(WITHDRAWN AND VACATED BY ORDER DATED 8/31/09.) Modified on 8/31/2009 (bkp).
June 5, 2009 60 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 54 Motion to Stay. Defendant is directed to post a supersedeas bond in the amount of $400,000. Signed by Judge William R. Wilson, Jr on 6/5/09. (dac)
April 23, 2009 45 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT re 44 Order granting plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment and dismissing the case. Signed by Judge William R. Wilson, Jr on 4/23/09. (WITHDRAWN AND VACATED BY ORDER DATED 8/31/09.)(bkp) Modified on 8/31/2009 (bkp).
March 31, 2009 38 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 33 MOTION to Strike 24 Statement of Facts (Local Rule 56.1). Signed by Judge William R. Wilson, Jr on 3/31/09. (bkp)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Porter v. Hartford Life & Accident Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Porter
Represented By: William David Duke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hartford Life & Accident Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?