Hall v. St John Missionary Baptist Church

Plaintiff: Sonya Hall
Defendant: St John Missionary Baptist Church
Case Number: 4:2008cv00645
Filed: July 30, 2008
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Civil Rights: Jobs Office
County: Pulaski
Presiding Judge: William R. Wilson
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 42:2000e Job Discrimination (Employment)

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 13, 2010 62 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 58 Motion for Bill of Costs and awarding defendant costs in the amount of $606.60. Signed by Judge William R. Wilson, Jr on 4/13/10. (bkp)
March 18, 2010 57 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT in favor of St John Missionary Baptist Church against Sonya Hall re 55 Jury Verdict. Signed by Judge William R. Wilson, Jr on 3/18/10. (bkp)
March 16, 2010 52 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 51 Motion in Limine. Signed by Judge William R. Wilson, Jr on 3/16/10. (bkp)
March 15, 2010 50 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER dismissing plaintiff's religious discrimination claim; and granting 49 defendant's Motion in Limine. Signed by Judge William R. Wilson, Jr on 3/15/10. (bkp)
February 23, 2010 45 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 22 Motion for Summary Judgment; granting in part and denying in part 25 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge William R. Wilson, Jr on 2/23/10. (bkp)
February 1, 2010 36 Opinion or Order of the Court LETTER ORDER re 33 Response in Opposition to Motion for Summary Judgment directing counsel to respond to this letter by noon, Friday, February 12, 2010. Signed by Judge William R. Wilson, Jr on 2/1/10. (bkp)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hall v. St John Missionary Baptist Church
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sonya Hall
Represented By: Stephen E. Fisher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: St John Missionary Baptist Church
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?