Qualls v. Union Pacific Railroad Company

Plaintiff: Leodus Qualls
Defendant: Union Pacific Railroad Company
Case Number: 4:2008cv00808
Filed: August 11, 2008
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Federal Employer's Liability Office
County: Jefferson
Presiding Judge: William R. Wilson
Nature of Suit: Both
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 45:51 Railways: Fed. Employer's Liability Act

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
January 13, 2010 34 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 27 plaintiff's voluntary Motion to Dismiss and dismissing case without prejudice. Signed by Judge William R. Wilson, Jr on 1/13/10. (bkp)
November 2, 2009 29 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 24 Motion to Continue the trial ddls; granting 24 Motion to Quash; denying 24 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney without prejudice; directing plaintiff to find new counsel by 5 p.m., Thuesday, December 29,2009; and deferring any action on the motion for summary judgment (de 16) and the request in the letter order (de 23) until further directions from the Court. Signed by Judge William R. Wilson, Jr on 11/2/09. (bkp)
October 30, 2009 23 Opinion or Order of the Court LETTER ORDER to counsel for plaintiff re 16 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Union Pacific Railroad Company directing counsel to reply to this letter by Monday, November 9, 2009, by 5 p.m.. Signed by Judge William R. Wilson, Jr on 10/30/09. (bkp)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Qualls v. Union Pacific Railroad Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Leodus Qualls
Represented By: John G. Zgourides
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Union Pacific Railroad Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?