Holloway et al v. Lott et al

Plaintiff: Charmmorcus Holloway, Sr, Emmanuel Doc Scott and Mashan Lee
Defendant: Wes Lott, Jason Harris, Macrice Sanders and Alison Walton
Case Number: 4:2008cv00821
Filed: August 11, 2008
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Prisoner: Civil Rights Office
County: Pulaski
Presiding Judge: G. Thomas Eisele
Referring Judge: H. David Young
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
February 3, 2011 114 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT pursuant to 113 Order Granting Summary Judgment for defts, all remaining claims asserted by pltf are hereby DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. Signed by Judge G. Thomas Eisele on 2/3/11. (vjt)
August 28, 2009 59 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING 40 Plaintiff's Motion to Compel; DENYING 46 Plaintiff's Motion for Order for Examination; and directing the Clerk to note the Docket Sheet that 51 Plaintiff's Motion to Amend is moot. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joe J. Volpe on 8/28/2009. (jas)
December 5, 2008 12 Opinion or Order of the Court DOCUMENT FILED IN ERROR (duplicate of docket entry 13 ) - DISREGARD. (mkf) (Docket text modified on 12/5/2008 to indicate the document was filed in error.) (thd)
October 16, 2008 9 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER finding that Mashan Lee and Emmanuel Scott should be removed from the Court's docket as Plaintiffs in the instant case, and their names terminated as parties to this action. Signed by Judge G. Thomas Eisele on 10/16/2008. (thd)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Holloway et al v. Lott et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charmmorcus Holloway, Sr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Emmanuel Doc Scott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mashan Lee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wes Lott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jason Harris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Macrice Sanders
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alison Walton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?