Shotts v. USA

Plaintiff: Dewitt Shotts
Defendant: USA
Case Number: 4:2008cv01779
Filed: August 21, 2008
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Taxes Office
County: Pulaski
Presiding Judge: Brian S. Miller
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: U.S. Government Defendant
Jury Demanded By: 28:1346 Recovery of IRS Tax

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 10, 2011 97 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT: Shotts's complaint is dismissed with prejudice by agreement. On Count I of the United States's counterclaim, judgment is entered in favor of the United States and against Dewitt Shotts in the amount of $217,701.70, plus statu tory interest accruing according to law from the date of assessment until the judgment is paid. On Count II of the United States's counterclaim, judgment is entered in favor of the United States and against Dewitt Shotts in the amount of $305,884.08, plus statutory interest accruing according to law from the date of assessment until the judgment is paid. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 5/10/11. (hph)
December 10, 2009 49 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 35 Motion to Dismiss; granting 45 Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery. Signed by Judge Brian S. Miller on 12/10/09. (bkp)
August 7, 2009 28 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 27 Motion to Compel; granting 27 Motion to Modify Scheduling Order; Pltf Dewitt Shotts is directed to provide his initial disclosures and responses to the government's written discovery on or before August 17, 2009; the Court will issue a new scheduling order extending the remaining deadlines. Signed by Judge Brian S. Miller on 8/7/09. (mkf)
June 2, 2009 22 Opinion or Order of the Court CONSENT JUDGMENT against Terri Shotts in the amount of $603,758.44, plus interest and statutory additions accruing from April 17, 2009 until the judgment is paid, with the U.S. and Terri shots each bearing their own litigation costs, including attorney's fees associated with this matter. Signed by Judge Brian S. Miller on 6/2/09. (bkp)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Shotts v. USA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dewitt Shotts
Represented By: Eugene G. Sayre
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: USA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?