Hawkins v. Byrd et al

Plaintiff: Cartus Hawkins, Sam Edward Thurmond, Sr and Sammie Brown
Defendant: Karl Byrd, Bobby Brown, K Neal, B Pickard, T Shock, John Randall and J Gramthom
Case Number: 4:2008cv01791
Filed: August 21, 2008
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Prison Condition: Civil Rights Office
County: Faulkner
Referring Judge: Beth Deere
Presiding Judge: William R. Wilson
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 25, 2009 104 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DISMISSING CASE with prejudice by reason of settlement. Signed by Judge William R. Wilson, Jr on 6/25/09. (mkf)
May 12, 2009 99 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 90 Partial Report and Recommendations and granting in part and denying in part 61 Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Kevin Neal, Glen Wilcox, Brianne Pickard, Joseph Granthom, Michelle Piechuski. Signed by Judge William R. Wilson, Jr on 5/12/09. (bkp)
April 9, 2009 86 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 78 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge William R. Wilson, Jr on 4/9/09. (bkp)
December 10, 2008 53 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Adopting 44 Partial Report and Recommendations; denying 43 Motion for TRO. Signed by Judge William R. Wilson, Jr on 12/10/08. (mkf)
November 12, 2008 40 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Adopting 32 Partial Report and Recommendations ; denying 21 Motion to Amend. Signed by Judge William R. Wilson, Jr on 11/12/08. (mkf)
October 20, 2008 30 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 18 Partial Report and Recommendations and dismissing defts Byrd, Brown, Shock, Randall, and Faulkner County without prejudice; dismissing plaintiffs Brown and Thurmond without prejudice so they may pursue their claims in separately filed actions and allowing pltf Hawkins to proceed on his due process claim against Sgt. Piechuski, and directing the Clerk of the Court top add Sgt. Piechuski as a party deft in this matter. Signed by Judge William R. Wilson, Jr on 10/20/08. (bkp)
October 17, 2008 28 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 15 Partial Report and Recommendations and denying 13 Motion to Amend/Correct filed by Cartus Hawkins. Signed by Judge William R. Wilson, Jr on 10/17/08. (bkp)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hawkins v. Byrd et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cartus Hawkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sam Edward Thurmond, Sr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sammie Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Karl Byrd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bobby Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: K Neal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: B Pickard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: T Shock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Randall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J Gramthom
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?