Thurmond et al v. Byrd et al

Plaintiff: Sam Edward Thurmond, Sr, Cartus Hawkins and Sammie Brown
Defendant: B Pickard, T Shock, John Randall, J Gramthom, Karl Byrd, Bobby Brown, K Neal and G Wilcox
Case Number: 4:2008cv01792
Filed: August 21, 2008
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Prison Condition: Civil Rights Office
County: Faulkner
Referring Judge: Beth Deere
Presiding Judge: William R. Wilson
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 23, 2009 157 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER OF DISMISSAL dismissing, with prejudice, the Complaint and all amendments. The Court retains jurisdiction for 30 days to vacate this order and to reopen the action if it is satisfactorily shown that settlement has not been completed and further litigation is necessary. Signed by Magistrate Judge Beth Deere on 6/23/09. (hph)
January 20, 2009 92 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 77 Motion for Order; denying 83 Motion to Compel; granting 87 Motion to Compel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Beth Deere on 1/20/09. (bkp)
October 20, 2008 37 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING Partial Report and Recommendations 26 and denying 21 Motion for TRO filed by Sam Edward Thurmond, Sr.. Signed by Judge William R. Wilson, Jr on 10/20/08. (bkp)
October 1, 2008 24 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Adopting 17 Partial Report and Recommendations ; denying 16 Motion to Amend/Correct and Pltf's Thurmond's Motion to Enjoin Plaintiffs as a Class Action (#10); Defendants Byrd, Brown, Shock, and Randall are DISMISSED, without preju dice; Pltfs Brown and Hawkins are DISMISSED, without prejuduice, from this case so that they may pursue their factually distinct claims in their separately filed actions; Pltf Thurmond's claims challenging his disciplinary conviction are DISMISSED without prejudice. Signed by Judge William R. Wilson, Jr on 10/01/08. (mkf)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Thurmond et al v. Byrd et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: B Pickard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: T Shock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Randall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J Gramthom
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Karl Byrd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bobby Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: K Neal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: G Wilcox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sam Edward Thurmond, Sr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cartus Hawkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sammie Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?