Universal Casualty Company v. Triple Transport Inc

Plaintiff: Universal Casualty Company
Defendant: Triple Transport Inc
Case Number: 4:2008cv01822
Filed: August 25, 2008
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Insurance Office
County: White
Presiding Judge: Brian S. Miller
Nature of Suit: Defendant
Cause of Action: Diversity
Jury Demanded By: 28:1332 Diversity-Insurance Contract

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 25, 2010 51 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER authorizing John Thornton, Rod Krug, Rush Royals and J. Cotten Cunningham to bring certain electronic devices into the Courthouse between Tuesday, August 31, 2010, and Friday, September 3, 2010, subject to the rules set forth in this Order. Signed by Judge Brian S. Miller on 8/25/10. (bkp)
August 11, 2010 43 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying Universal's 33 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge Brian S. Miller on 8/11/10. (vjt)
November 10, 2009 25 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER authorizing persons listed in this Order to bring certain electronics into the Richard Sheppard Arnold Courthousse between Monday, November 16, 2009, and Wednesday, November 18, 2009. Signed by Judge Brian S. Miller on 11/10/09. (bkp)
November 5, 2009 24 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 23 Motion to Quash but ordering the witnesses to submit to depositions during normal business hours at the law firm of Crane & Butler in Magnolia, Arkansas. Signed by Judge Brian S. Miller on 11/5/09. (bkp)
July 13, 2009 17 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 10 Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge Brian S. Miller on 7/13/09. (bkp)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Universal Casualty Company v. Triple Transport Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Universal Casualty Company
Represented By: David M. Donovan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Triple Transport Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?