Weaver v. Barr Pharmaceuticals Inc et al

Plaintiff: Brenda Weaver
Defendant: Barr Pharmaceuticals Inc and Barr Laboratories
Case Number: 4:2008cv01848
Filed: August 28, 2008
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability Office
County: Out of State
Presiding Judge: William R. Wilson
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: Diversity
Jury Demanded By: 28:1332 Diversity-Personal Injury-Product Liability

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 6, 2013 22 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing Plaintiff to provide any additional evidentiary support for claims against generic manufacturers by 5 p.m., Monday, May 20, 2013. Signed by Judge Billy Roy Wilson on 05/06/2013. (jak)
April 1, 2013 19 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing Plaintiff(s) to file FDA correspondence and, if needed, an Addendum to the Amended Complaint by 5:00 p.m. on 4/8/2013. Signed by Judge Billy Roy Wilson on 4/1/2013.(kpr)
January 29, 2013 14 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER designating cases to proceed with case-specific discovery under Practice and Procedure Order 9. Plaintiff(s) are directed to provide Defendant(s) with updated medical authorization within 3 weeks of the date of this Order. Signed by Judge Billy Roy Wilson on 1/29/2013.(jak)
September 11, 2012 12 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying without prejudice Defendants' Motions for Judgment on the Pleadings. Plaintiffs are permitted to amend their individual complaints within 3 weeks of the date of this Order. Signed by Judge Billy Roy Wilson on 9/11/12. (kpr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Weaver v. Barr Pharmaceuticals Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Barr Pharmaceuticals Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Barr Laboratories
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brenda Weaver
Represented By: Natasha D. Hanberry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?