Purdy et al v. Wyeth Inc et al
Plaintiff: Joann Purdy and Alan Purdy
Defendant: Wyeth Inc, Wyeth Pharmaceuticals Inc, ESI Lederle, Wyeth Ayerst International Inc, Pharmacia Corporation, Pfizer Inc, Greenstone Ltd, Barr Pharmaceuticals Inc, Barr Laboratories Inc, Duramed Pharmaceuticals Inc, Bristol Myers Squibb Company, Solvay Pharmaceuticals Inc, Novo Nordisk Inc, Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation, Mead Johnson & Company, Warner Chilcott Inc, Watson Pharmaceuticals Inc and Pharmacia & Upjohn Company
Case Number: 4:2008cv02700
Filed: September 17, 2008
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Office: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability Office
County: Out of State
Presiding Judge: Billy Roy Wilson
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 20, 2014. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 20, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 37 (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) ORDER granting #36 Plaintiff's Motion to Dismiss With Prejudice. Accordingly, this CASE is DISMISSED with prejudice. Signed by Judge Billy Roy Wilson on 05/20/14. (dmm)
May 20, 2014 Filing 36 MOTION to Dismiss by All Plaintiffs (Morrison, Matthew)
January 29, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER designating cases to proceed with case-specific discovery under Practice and Procedure Order 9. Plaintiff(s) are directed to provide Defendant(s) with updated medical authorization within 3 weeks of the date of this Order. Signed by Judge Billy Roy Wilson on 1/29/2013. (jak)
March 24, 2009 Filing 34 NOTICE of Appearance by Edward F. Fox on behalf of Wyeth Ayerst International Inc, Wyeth Inc, Wyeth Pharmaceuticals Inc (Fox, Edward)
March 23, 2009 Filing 33 NOTICE of Appearance by Carrie L Hund on behalf of Wyeth Ayerst International Inc, Wyeth Inc, Wyeth Pharmaceuticals Inc (Hund, Carrie)
March 18, 2009 Filing 32 NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew J. Morrison on behalf of Joann Purdy, Alan Purdy (Morrison, Matthew)
March 10, 2009 Filing 31 NOTICE of Appearance by Carrie L Hund on behalf of Wyeth Inc, Wyeth Pharmaceuticals Inc (Hund, Carrie)
March 9, 2009 Filing 30 NOTICE of Appearance by Edward F. Fox on behalf of Wyeth Inc, Wyeth Pharmaceuticals Inc (Fox, Edward)
October 29, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 29 (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) ORDER granting #28 Defendant's PPO8 Motion to Dismiss. Accordingly, Novo Nordisk, Inc. is DISMISSED based on the terms and conditions in PPO8. Signed by Judge William R. Wilson, Jr on 10/29/08. (dmm)
October 29, 2008 Filing 28 MOTION to Dismiss PURSUANT TO PRACTICE AND PROCEDURE ORDER NO. 8 by Novo Nordisk Inc (Sterchi, Thomas)
October 15, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 27 (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) ORDER granting #26 Defendants' PPO 8 Motion to Dismiss. Accordingly, Defendants Barr Laboratories, Inc., Barr Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Duramed Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Bristol-Myers Squibb Company, Mead-Johnson & Company, Solvay Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation, Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc., and Warner-Chilcott, Inc. are DISMISSED based on the terms and conditions in PPO 8. Signed by Judge William R. Wilson, Jr on 10/15/08. (dmm)
October 14, 2008 Filing 26 MOTION to Dismiss Defendants Barr Laboratories, Inc., Barr Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Duramed Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Bristol-Myers Squibb Company, Mead-Johnson & Company, Solvay Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation, Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc., and Warner-Chilcott, Inc. Pursuant to Practice and Procedure Order No. 8 by Barr Pharmaceuticals Inc, Barr Laboratories Inc, Duramed Pharmaceuticals Inc (Saelinger, Gina)
October 7, 2008 Filing 25 Corporate Disclosure Statement (Rule 7.1) by Novo Nordisk Inc (Lysaught, Patrick)
October 7, 2008 Filing 24 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand and Affirmative Defenses by Novo Nordisk Inc.(Lysaught, Patrick)
September 23, 2008 Filing 23 NOTICE of Appearance by Paul S. Penticuff on behalf of Novo Nordisk Inc (Penticuff, Paul)
September 23, 2008 Filing 22 NOTICE of Appearance by Patrick Lysaught on behalf of Novo Nordisk Inc (Lysaught, Patrick)
September 23, 2008 Filing 21 NOTICE of Appearance by Thomas N. Sterchi on behalf of Novo Nordisk Inc (Sterchi, Thomas)
September 18, 2008 Filing 20 NOTICE of Appearance by Kerry Carson Green on behalf of Watson Pharmaceuticals Inc (Green, Kerry)
September 17, 2008 Filing 18 MEMORANDUM to counsel from the Clerk of Court re: receipt of case from transferor court with a copy of Standing Order dated 8/11/2005 filed in 4:03-cv-1507 attached. (rhm)
September 17, 2008 Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance by Brian A. Troyer on behalf of Solvay Pharmaceuticals Inc (Troyer, Brian)
September 17, 2008 Filing 16 Case electronically transferred in from District of Minnesota; Case Number 0:08-cv-04426. Electronic file with documents numbered 1 - 15, copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
September 2, 2008 Filing 15 Certified Copy of Transfer Order (CTO-145) from the Judicial Panel on Multi-District Litigation; transferring case to the Eastern District of Arkansas for coordinated or consolidated pretrial proceedings. Case assigned to Judge William R Wilson, Jr. (kt) [Transferred from mnd on 9/17/2008.]
August 8, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER OF RECUSAL. Judge Ann D. Montgomery recused. Case reassigned to Senior Judge Paul A. Magnuson for all further proceedings. NOTE: the new case number is 08cv4426 PAM/JJG. Please use this case number for all subsequent pleadings. Signed by Judge Ann D. Montgomery on 8/8/08. (JME) [Transferred from mnd on 9/17/2008.]
August 1, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER NO. 1 - Establishing Administrative Case 0:08-ad-0001 for management of Hormone Replacement Therapy Litigation cases in the District of Minnesota. IT IS ORDERED that: Defendants in any HRT action filed in this Court after June 1, 2008 need not answer, or otherwise respond to Plaintiffs' HRT complaints until twenty (20) days after notice of formal transfer or further Order of this Court. It is further Ordered that Defendants who have previously filed a Rule 7.1 Disclosure Statement need not file any further such disclosures unless there is a material change in corporate information. Signed by Chief Judge Michael J. Davis on 7/30/08. (Attachments: #1 Case List) Associated Cases: 0:08-ad-00001 et al. This Order will be entered multiple times for groups of HRT cases filed in the District of Minnesota. (LJG) [Transferred from mnd on 9/17/2008.]
July 28, 2008 Filing 12 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation re #10 Notice of Appearance, #11 Rule 7.1 - Disclosure Statement (Freestone, Amy) [Transferred from mnd on 9/17/2008.]
July 28, 2008 Filing 11 RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation of Novartis Finance Corporation, Novartis Corporation, Novartis Holding AG, Novartis AG as corporate parent and/or publicly held company. (Freestone, Amy) [Transferred from mnd on 9/17/2008.]
July 28, 2008 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Amy R Freestone on behalf of Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation (Freestone, Amy) [Transferred from mnd on 9/17/2008.]
July 28, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER APPROVING re #7 Stipulation regarding Answer pending MDL Transfer filed by Novo Nordisk, Inc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jeanne J. Graham on 7/28/08. (RLR) [Transferred from mnd on 9/17/2008.]
July 25, 2008 Filing 8 INITIAL ANSWER to Complaint by Bristol-Myers Squibb Company. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service) (Morris, Frederick) [Transferred from mnd on 9/17/2008.]
July 25, 2008 Filing 7 STIPULATION Regarding Extension of Time by Novo Nordisk, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Newkirk, Christopher) [Transferred from mnd on 9/17/2008.]
July 25, 2008 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Pharmacia and Upjohn Company, Pharmacia Corporation, Pfizer, Inc., Greenstone, Ltd. re #5 Rule 7.1 - Disclosure Statement, #4 Answer to Complaint (Iversen, Tara) [Transferred from mnd on 9/17/2008.]
July 25, 2008 Filing 5 RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Pharmacia and Upjohn Company, Pharmacia Corporation, Pfizer, Inc., Greenstone, Ltd. that there is no such parent or publicly held corporation to report. (Iversen, Tara) [Transferred from mnd on 9/17/2008.]
July 25, 2008 Filing 4 Initial ANSWER to Complaint by Pharmacia and Upjohn Company, Pharmacia Corporation, Pfizer, Inc., Greenstone, Ltd.. (Iversen, Tara) [Transferred from mnd on 9/17/2008.]
July 14, 2008 Filing 3 RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Warner Chilcott, Inc. of Warner Chilcott Corporation and Warner Chilcott Limited as corporate parent and/or publicly held company. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Weldon, Melissa) [Transferred from mnd on 9/17/2008.]
July 14, 2008 Filing 2 ANSWER to Complaint by Warner Chilcott, Inc.. (Weldon, Melissa) [Transferred from mnd on 9/17/2008.]
July 2, 2008 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against all defendants ( Filing fee $ 350 receipt number 40025210.) assigned to Judge Ann D Montgomery per Master List and referred to Magistrate Judge Jeanne J Graham, filed by Joann Purdy, Alan Purdy. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (kt) [Transferred from mnd on 9/17/2008.]
July 2, 2008 Summons Issued as to Wyeth-Ayerst International, Inc., Pharmacia and Upjohn Company, Pharmacia Corporation, Pfizer, Inc., Greenstone, Ltd., Barr Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Barr Laboratories, Inc., Duramed Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Bristol-Myers Squibb Company, Solvay Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Novo Nordisk, Inc., Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation, Mead-Johnson & Company, Warner Chilcott, Inc., Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Wyeth, Inc., Wyeth Pharmaceuticals Inc., ESI Lederle. (kt) [Transferred from mnd on 9/17/2008.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Purdy et al v. Wyeth Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joann Purdy
Represented By: Gale Diane Pearson
Represented By: Matthew J. Morrison
Represented By: Stephen J. Randall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alan Purdy
Represented By: Gale Diane Pearson
Represented By: Matthew J. Morrison
Represented By: Stephen J. Randall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wyeth Inc
Represented By: Edward F. Fox
Represented By: Carrie L. Hund
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wyeth Pharmaceuticals Inc
Represented By: Edward F. Fox
Represented By: Carrie L. Hund
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ESI Lederle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wyeth Ayerst International Inc
Represented By: Edward F. Fox
Represented By: Carrie L. Hund
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pharmacia Corporation
Represented By: Tara Vavrosky Iversen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pfizer Inc
Represented By: Tara Vavrosky Iversen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Greenstone Ltd
Represented By: Tara Vavrosky Iversen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Barr Pharmaceuticals Inc
Represented By: Gina M. Saelinger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Barr Laboratories Inc
Represented By: Gina M. Saelinger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Duramed Pharmaceuticals Inc
Represented By: Gina M. Saelinger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bristol Myers Squibb Company
Represented By: Frederick W. Morris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Solvay Pharmaceuticals Inc
Represented By: Brian A. Troyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Novo Nordisk Inc
Represented By: Thomas N. Sterchi
Represented By: Christopher D. Newkirk
Represented By: Patrick Lysaught
Represented By: Paul S. Penticuff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation
Represented By: Amy R. Fiterman
Represented By: Bridget M. Ahmann
Represented By: James A. O'Neal
Represented By: John P. Borger
Represented By: Linda S. Svitak
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mead Johnson & Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Warner Chilcott Inc
Represented By: Daniel C. Adams
Represented By: Melissa M. Weldon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Watson Pharmaceuticals Inc
Represented By: Kerry Carson Green
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pharmacia & Upjohn Company
Represented By: Tara Vavrosky Iversen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?