Burroughs v. Central Arkansas Development Council et al

Plaintiff: Elizabeth Burroughs
Defendant: Central Arkansas Development Council, Larry Cogburn, Diane Tatum, Randy Lawson, John Selig, Joni Jones, Tonya Russell and Jamie Morrison
Movant: USA
Case Number: 4:2008cv02757
Filed: January 6, 2010
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Little Rock Office
Presiding Judge: James M. Moody
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 31:3729 False Claims Act

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 14, 2011 199 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT : The amended complaint is dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 4/14/11. (hph)
August 4, 2010 128 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 120 Motion to Compel filed by Central Ar Development Council & Larry Cogburn. Burroughs must respond to the first set of interrogatories & requests for production of documents w/i 14 days from the entry of this Order. As to the request for expenses, Burroughs has 14 days from the entry of this Order to file a paper explaining why the Court should not grant the motion for expenses. The Court therefore withholds ruling on the expenses issue. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 8/4/2010. (jct)
May 10, 2010 116 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 109 Motion for certification under 28 U.S.C. §1292(b). Signed by Judge James M. Moody on 5/10/10. (dac)
May 3, 2010 113 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER withdrawing 110 Motion for Entry of Judgment under Rule 54(b). Signed by Judge James M. Moody on 5/3/10. (bkp)
April 26, 2010 108 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing the Clerk of the Court to withdraw the 107 Judgment entered on April 2 6,2010. Signed by Judge James M. Moody on 4/26/10. (bkp)
April 19, 2010 106 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that pltf's 93 Motion for Leave to File a Second Amended Complaint is DENIED; the Motions to Dismiss by Defts Diane Tatum 47 and Joni Jones, Jamie Morrison, Tonya Russell, and John Selig 67 are GRANTED; pltf's First Amended Com plaint is dismissed without prejudice as to Deft Randy Lawson pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. Rule 4(m); the claims under Title VII 1983, the Arkansas Civil Rights Act, and Arkansas state law for breach of contract remain as to Defts CADC and Larry Cogburn, and the retaliation claim as to Deft CADC. Signed by Judge James M. Moody on 4/19/10. (vjt)
January 6, 2010 90 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 42 Motion to Dismiss; denying 56 Motion to Dismiss; finding as moot 64 Motion for Order; granting 65 Motion for Order; finding as moot 72 Motion for Order; denying 74 Motion for Leave to File; denying 80 Motion for Leave to File. Signed by Judge James M. Moody on 1/6/10. (bkp)
October 7, 2009 41 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 39 Motion to Extend Time; denying 40 Motion for Declaratory Judgment; denying 24 Motion to Dismiss; and directing the U.S. Marshal to serve the summons and First Amended Complaint on John Selig, Diane Tatum and Jamie Morrison without prepayment of costs. Signed by Judge James M. Moody on 10/7/09. (bkp)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Burroughs v. Central Arkansas Development Council et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elizabeth Burroughs
Represented By: Larry J. Steele
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Central Arkansas Development Council
Represented By: Gary D. Jiles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Larry Cogburn
Represented By: Gary D. Jiles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Diane Tatum
Represented By: Lori Freno-Engman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Randy Lawson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Selig
Represented By: Breck G. Hopkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joni Jones
Represented By: Breck G. Hopkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tonya Russell
Represented By: Breck G. Hopkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jamie Morrison
Represented By: Breck G. Hopkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Movant: USA
Represented By: Shannon S. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?