Miles v. Peabody Hotel et al

Plaintiff: Kathy Lynette Miles
Defendant: Peabody Hotel, James Mason, Ankia Hollman, Gregg Herming and June
Case Number: 4:2008cv02801
Filed: September 18, 2008
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Civil Rights: Jobs Office
County: Pulaski
Presiding Judge: Susan Webber Wright
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 42:2000e Job Discrimination (Employment)

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
February 15, 2011 94 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 87 Bill of Costs filed by BEX Inc, BG Excelsior Limited Partnership, BHMG LLC. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 2/15/11. (vjt)
January 14, 2011 81 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT pursuant to 80 Order entered this date, judgment is hereby entered in favor of BEX Inc, BG Excelsior Limited Partnership, and BHMG LLC dismissing the complaint of Kathy Lynette Miles with prejudice. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 1/14/11. (vjt)
July 7, 2010 64 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing pltf to file notice within 10 days from the entry date of this Order stating whether she demands a jury trial and, if so, the basis for her demand. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 7/7/10. (vjt)
January 15, 2009 33 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER appointing Douglas W. Bonner, Jr. to represent the plaintiff and directing the Clerk to send counsel a copy of this Order 30 . Signed by Magistrate Judge Henry L. Jones, Jr on 1/15/09. (bkp)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Miles v. Peabody Hotel et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kathy Lynette Miles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Peabody Hotel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Mason
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ankia Hollman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gregg Herming
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: June
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?