Ware v. Social Security Administration

Plaintiff: Alex K Ware
Defendant: Social Security Administration
Case Number: 4:2008cv02908
Filed: September 19, 2008
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI Office
County: Pulaski
Referring Judge: Jerry W. Cavaneau
Presiding Judge: James M. Moody
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: U.S. Government Defendant
Jury Demanded By: 42:405 Review of HHS Decision (SSID)

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
February 16, 2010 22 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER adopting Report and Recommendations 21 finding as moot 11 Motion for Attorney Fees; granting plaintiff's 12 Motion for Attorney Fees in the amount of $4,225.00 and directing the Commissioner to certify and pay to Timothy M. White, atttorney for the plaintiff, the amount awarded pursuant to the EAJA. Signed by Judge James M. Moody on 2/16/10. (bkp)
January 28, 2010 21 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS that pltf's first MOTION for Attorney's Fees pursuant to EAJA 11 be DENIED AS MOOT and pltf's second MOTION for Attorney's Fees 12 be GRANTED; the Commissioner be directed to certify and pay to Timothy M. White, attorney for pltf, an award of $4,225.00 pursuant to the EAJA; Objections to R&R due 14 days after being served. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerry W. Cavaneau on 1/28/10. (vjt)
October 21, 2009 14 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT re 13 Amended Order reversing and remanding under the fourth sentence of 42 U.S. C. sect. 405(g) to the Commissioner of the Social Security Administration for further administrative proceedings. Signed by Judge James M. Moody on 10/21/09. (bkp)
March 11, 2009 10 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 9 Motion to Remand and remanding this matter to the Commissioner for a de novo hearing, pursuant to the sixth sentence of 42 U.S.C. section 405(g). Signed by Judge James M. Moody on 3/11/09. (bkp)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ware v. Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alex K Ware
Represented By: Timothy M. White
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Social Security Administration
Represented By: Stacey Elise McCord
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?