United Communications Corporation v. AMR International Inc

Plaintiff: United Communications Corporation
Defendant: AMR International Inc
Case Number: 4:2008cv03004
Filed: September 22, 2008
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Contract: Other Office
County: Pulaski
Presiding Judge: James M. Moody
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: Diversity
Jury Demanded By: 28:1441 Petition for Removal- Breach of Contract

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
November 5, 2009 51 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 46 Motion for Reconsideration 4 and dismissing with prejudice the Counterclaim filed by AMR International Inc against UCC. Signed by Judge James M. Moody on 11/5/09. (bkp)
October 16, 2009 45 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT re 44 Order Dismissing Case and awarding to plaintiff a total judgment in the amount of $215,039.65, together with interest from this date until the date paid at a rate of .36% per annum. Signed by Judge James M. Moody on 10/16/09. (bkp) (Docket text modified on 10/19/2009 to correct the description of the document filed.) (thd).
January 28, 2009 31 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 24 Motion for Joinder; granting 26 Motion to Continue, AMRIk to file its Answer and Amended Counterclaims within five days of the entry of this Order, and removing this case from the trial docket the week of April 20, 2009, an amended scheduling order to be entered forthwith. Signed by Judge James M. Moody on 1/28/09. (bkp)
November 24, 2008 19 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 6 Motion to Transfer Case. Signed by Judge James M. Moody on 11/24/08. (bkp)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United Communications Corporation v. AMR International Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United Communications Corporation
Represented By: James Maurice Rogers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AMR International Inc
Represented By: Matthew Byron Finch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?