Mahmoud et al v. Ford Motor Company et al

Plaintiff: Bassam Mahmoud and Zenaida Mahmoud
Defendant: Ford Motor Company, TRW Automotive, TRW Inc, TRW Vehicle Safety Systems Inc and TRW Automotive Safety Systems Arkansas Inc
Case Number: 4:2008cv03582
Filed: October 2, 2008
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability Office
County: White
Presiding Judge: William R. Wilson
Nature of Suit: Both
Cause of Action: Diversity
Jury Demanded By: 28:1332 Diversity-Personal Injury-Product Liability

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 24, 2011 89 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT: Pursuant to the 88 Order entered today, Plaintiffs' complaint is dismissed without prejudice as to all defendants. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 8/24/2011. (dmn)
May 6, 2010 39 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER referring the issue of where the deposition should take place to Magistrate H. David Young. Signed by Judge William R. Wilson, Jr on 5/6/10. (bkp)
April 22, 2010 38 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 31 Motion to Compel. Signed by Judge William R. Wilson, Jr on 4/21/10. (bkp)
April 8, 2010 35 Opinion or Order of the Court LETTER ORDER re 34 Response in Support of Motion, filed by Zenaida Mahmoud, Bassam Mahmoud: Defendants should file a reply no later than 4 p.m., Tuesday, April 13, 2010. Signed by Judge William R. Wilson, Jr on 4/8/10. (bkp)
April 1, 2010 33 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 31 MOTION to Compel And For Extension Of Expert Designation Deadlines filed by Zenaida Mahmoud, Bassam Mahmoud directing plaintiff's counsel to send a copy of the transcript of the deposition, with explanations of the witness's deficiencies no later than 4 p.m., Monday, April 5, 12010. Signed by Judge William R. Wilson, Jr on 4/1/10. (bkp)
January 14, 2010 27 Opinion or Order of the Court INTERIM CONSENT CONFIDENTIALITY ORDER. Signed by Judge William R. Wilson, Jr on 1/14/10. (bkp)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mahmoud et al v. Ford Motor Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bassam Mahmoud
Represented By: Clyde Tab Turner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Zenaida Mahmoud
Represented By: Clyde Tab Turner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ford Motor Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TRW Automotive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TRW Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TRW Vehicle Safety Systems Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TRW Automotive Safety Systems Arkansas Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?