Towne v. Arkansas Veterans Home et al

Plaintiff: Arline Towne
Defendant: Arkansas Veterans Home, David Fletcher, Mike Turner and Albert Wilson
Case Number: 4:2008cv03585
Filed: October 3, 2008
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Civil Rights: Jobs Office
County: Pulaski
Presiding Judge: James M. Moody
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 42:2000e Job Discrimination (Employment)

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 31, 2009 43 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT : Pursuant to the Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law entered on this date, Judgment is entered in favor of Defendants. Plaintiff's complaint is dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Judge James M. Moody on 7/31/09. (hph)
July 24, 2009 39 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER authorizing plaintiff's counsel, Rickey Hicks, to bring cell phones and electronic devices into the courthouse for this proceeding scheduled to begin July 27, 2009. Signed by Judge James M. Moody on 7/24/09. (bkp)
July 17, 2009 33 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 22 defts' Motion for Summary Judgment and dismissing deft Mike Turner. Signed by Judge James M. Moody on 7/17/09. (bkp)
June 10, 2009 21 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 18 Motion for Discovery to allow plaintiff up to and including June 22, 2009 in which to complete depositions; granting 20 Motion for Extension of Time to File Dispositive Motions up to and including June 26, 2009. Signed by Judge James M. Moody on 6/10/09. (bkp)
January 29, 2009 13 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 3 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge James M. Moody on 1/29/09. (bkp)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Towne v. Arkansas Veterans Home et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Arline Towne
Represented By: Rickey H. Hicks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arkansas Veterans Home
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Fletcher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mike Turner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Albert Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?