Doerfler et al v. American Home Products Corporation et al

Plaintiff: Blodwyn Doerfler and Judson Doerfler
Defendant: American Home Products Corporation, Wyeth Inc, Wyeth Ayerst Pharmaceuticals Inc, Wyeth Ayerst International Inc, Wyeth Laboratories Inc, Wyeth Pharmaceuticals, Wyeth Pharmaceuticals Inc, Warner Chilcott US LLC, Bristol Myers Squibb Company, Solvay Pharmaceuticals Inc, Solvay America Inc, Greenstone LLC, Pharmacia & Upjohn Company Inc, Pfizer Inc, Rite Aid of WV Inc, Barr Laboratories Inc, ESI Lederle Inc, Dannemiller Memorial Educational Foundation Inc, Designwrite Inc, Designwrite LLC, Ketchum Inc, Klemptner Advertising Inc, Saatchi & Saatchi Healthcare Communications Inc, American College of Obstetricians and Gynecologists, American College of Physicians and National Committee for Quality Assurance
Case Number: 4:2008cv03620
Filed: October 16, 2008
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability Office
County: Out of State
Presiding Judge: William R. Wilson
Nature of Suit: Both
Cause of Action: Diversity
Jury Demanded By: 28:1332 Diversity-Personal Injury-Product Liability

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 11, 2009 109 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 92 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction; Defendants DesignWrite LLC, DesignWrite Inc, Ketchum Inc, and Saatchi & Saatchi Healthcare Communications Inc are DISMISSED. Signed by Judge William R. Wilson, Jr on 3/11/09. (mkf)
December 19, 2008 89 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 88 Motion to Dismiss Party Defendants. Signed by Judge William R. Wilson, Jr on 12/19/08. (mkf)
December 9, 2008 85 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 83 Joint MOTION for Order With Respect to Filing of Motions to Dismiss; Pltf should file a response to ACP's and ACOG's Motion to Dismiss (Doc. No. 83) by 5 p.m., Tuesday, December 16, 2008; amended ddls are established which will apply to every newly transferred West Virginia case that was filed by the Calwell Practice, PLLC. Signed by Judge William R. Wilson, Jr on 12/9/08. (mkf)
November 5, 2008 77 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER setting filing ddls for every newly transferred West Virginia case that was filed by the Calwell Practice PLLC. Signed by Judge William R. Wilson, Jr on 11/5/08. (mkf)
October 29, 2008 75 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER extending the answer deadline in every newly transferred West Virginia case that was filed by the Calwell Practice, PLLC; the Court will hear from counsel from both sides as to when the answer deadlines should be--if the Court does require answers. Signed by Judge William R. Wilson, Jr on 10/29/08. (mkf)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Doerfler et al v. American Home Products Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Home Products Corporation
Represented By: Pamela D. Tarr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wyeth Inc
Represented By: Pamela D. Tarr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wyeth Ayerst Pharmaceuticals Inc
Represented By: Pamela D. Tarr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wyeth Ayerst International Inc
Represented By: Pamela D. Tarr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wyeth Laboratories Inc
Represented By: Pamela D. Tarr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wyeth Pharmaceuticals
Represented By: Pamela D. Tarr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wyeth Pharmaceuticals Inc
Represented By: Pamela D. Tarr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Warner Chilcott US LLC
Represented By: John D. Winter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bristol Myers Squibb Company
Represented By: Alan R. Vickery
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Solvay Pharmaceuticals Inc
Represented By: Patricia Proctor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Solvay America Inc
Represented By: Patricia Proctor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Greenstone LLC
Represented By: Tamela J. White
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pharmacia & Upjohn Company Inc
Represented By: Tamela J. White
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pfizer Inc
Represented By: Tamela J. White
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rite Aid of WV Inc
Represented By: Pamela D. Tarr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Barr Laboratories Inc
Represented By: William Scott Wickline
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ESI Lederle Inc
Represented By: Pamela D. Tarr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dannemiller Memorial Educational Foundation Inc
Represented By: William D. Wilmoth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Designwrite Inc
Represented By: Pamela D. Tarr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Designwrite LLC
Represented By: Pamela D. Tarr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ketchum Inc
Represented By: Pamela D. Tarr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Klemptner Advertising Inc
Represented By: Pamela D. Tarr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Saatchi & Saatchi Healthcare Communications Inc
Represented By: Pamela D. Tarr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American College of Obstetricians and Gynecologists
Represented By: Frederic T. Knape
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American College of Physicians
Represented By: Mychal Sommer Schulz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: National Committee for Quality Assurance
Represented By: Bian A. Glasser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Blodwyn Doerfler
Represented By: Thomas G. Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Judson Doerfler
Represented By: Thomas G. Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?