McDowell et al v. Price et al

Plaintiff: Kennith McDowell, Robert Maulding, Gregory J Stickney, Luther Stripling and Rudy Kyle
Defendant: Elbert Price, Mary Ruth Price, Bud Price's Excavating Service Inc Profit-Sharing Plan, Price's Utility Contractors Inc Retirement Plan, Price's Utility Contractors Inc and Bud Price's Excavating Service Inc
Case Number: 4:2008cv03979
Filed: October 27, 2008
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Labor: E.R.I.S.A. Office
County: Pulaski
Presiding Judge: Susan Webber Wright
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 29:1132 E.R.I.S.A.-Employee Benefits

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 15, 2012 562 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT pursuant to 561 Order entered this date, judgment is hereby entered for the plaintiffs. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 10/15/12. (vjt)
June 27, 2012 551 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that the pltfs shall submit a brief as directed on or before 7/9/12. Signed by Magistrate Judge H. David Young on 6/27/12. (vjt)
April 17, 2012 537 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that pltfs' 534 appeal of the Magistrate Judge's Order 526 is DENIED. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 4/17/12. (vjt)
April 12, 2012 535 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that pltfs' 531 Appeal of the Magistrate Judge's April 4, 2012 Order 524 is DENIED. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 4/12/12. (vjt)
April 10, 2012 532 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 522 Partial Report and Recommendations in their entirety; therefore, pltfs' 461 Motion for Reconsideration is DENIED. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 4/10/12. (vjt)
April 6, 2012 526 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that 485 Motion for Order is granted in the following respect; the Court will no longer entertain motions from the pltfs nor the defts except as stated; granting in part and denying in part 495 Motion for Discovery; denying 497 Motion for Ruling; denying 500 Motion for Order; denying 505 Motion for Order; denying 509 Motion for Ruling; deadlines established for bringing this case to a conclusion. Signed by Magistrate Judge H. David Young on 4/6/12. (vjt)
March 23, 2012 507 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying pltfs' 504 Appeal of Magistrate Judge Decision. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 3/23/12. (vjt)
February 15, 2012 459 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 450 Partial Report and Recommendations in their entirety; therefore, the motions for summary judgment filed by the pltfs 318 330 are granted in part and denied in part; defts' motion for summary judgment 320 is denied in full; the parties shall file short briefs as directed within 14 days. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 2/15/12. (vjt)
September 19, 2011 424 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING pltfs' 421 Appeal of Magistrate Judge's Order. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 9/19/11. (vjt)
March 15, 2011 383 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying pltfs' 382 Appeal of Magistrate Judge's Order 380 ; the Court also declines to enter a stay; pltfs may however seek a stay of this Court's Order from the Eighth Circuit Court of Appeals. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 3/15/11. (vjt)
January 14, 2011 369 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING 368 Appeal of Magistrate Judge Decision denying Rule 11 Sanctions to District Court, filed by Daniel Stripling, David Ellis, Kennith McDowell, Robert Maulding, Rudy Kyle, James Milner, Luther Stripling, James Joslin, Joe Ellis, Fred Dollar, Janet Stripling. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 1/14/11. (vjt)
November 19, 2010 353 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER, the Court will address the issue of appointing Judge Young a special master to perform an accounting, if necessary, following receipt of Judge Young's Findings and Recommendation. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 11/19/10. (vjt)
October 29, 2010 337 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER declining to adopt the 334 Findings and Recommendation; referring the matter back to Judge Young for further proceedings and recommendations; directing the plaintiffs to file an amended Local Rule 56.1 statement within 14 days of the date of this Order; directing the defendants to file an initial Local Rule 56.1 statement within 14 days of the date of this Order; allowing the parties to file responses to the Local Rule 56.1 statements within 28 days of this Order and to file replies wit hin 35 days from the date of this Order; giving the parties 14 days from the date of this Order to be heard on the issue of appointing Judge Young a special master to perform an accounting; continuing the 1/24/2011 trial date; and denying 332 Plaintiff's Motion for entry of an Order granting summary judgment. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 10/29/2010. (thd)
April 29, 2010 296 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 293 plaintiffs' Appeal of Magistrate Judge Decision to District Court. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 4/29/10. (bkp)
April 16, 2010 287 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part motions 126 128 133 161 220 . Signed by Magistrate Judge Henry L. Jones, Jr on 4/16/10. (bkp)
March 26, 2010 272 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER adopting the findings and recommendations in their entirety as this Court's findings; and denying, without prejudice, 118 Plaintiff's Motion to Set Aside Defendants' 7/27/09 Amendment of the Bud Price's Excavating Service, Inc. Profit Sharing Plan. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 3/26/10. (hph)
March 23, 2010 270 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that pltf's 268 Appeal of the Magistrate Judge's Order 257 denying pltfs' motion to exclude testimony by the Friday Law Firm is hereby DENIED. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 3/23/10. (vjt)
March 8, 2010 257 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 133 Motion to Amend/Correct; finding as moot 134 Motion to Compel; finding as moot 134 Motion for Sanctions; finding as moot 134 Motion to Expedite; denying 137 Motion to Expedite; denying 153 M otion to Expedite; denying 155 Motion to Expedite; denying 166 Motion for Order; granting 169 Motion to Amend/Correct; denying 171 Motion for Order; denying 173 Motion for Order; finding as moot 175 Motion for Order; denying 204 Motion for Order; denying 215 Motion to Exclude; denying 245 Motion for Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Henry L. Jones, Jr on 3/8/10. (bkp)
February 19, 2010 228 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 209 Motion to Clarify Issues to be Decided at the February 25, 2010 hearing. Signed by Magistrate Judge Henry L. Jones, Jr on 2/19/10. (bkp)
September 29, 2009 75 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing defendants to reply by no later than September 30, 2009, at 12:00 noon to 73 MOTION to Stay Issue to Keep the Plans in this Case Open Until Judgment is rendered. Signed by Magistrate Judge Henry L. Jones, Jr on 9/29/09. (bkp)
July 10, 2009 55 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 44 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 7/10/09. (bkp)
January 8, 2009 21 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 17 Motion to Disqualify Counsel.. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 1/8/09. (bkp)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McDowell et al v. Price et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kennith McDowell
Represented By: Diana McWilliams Maulding
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Maulding
Represented By: Diana McWilliams Maulding
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gregory J Stickney
Represented By: Diana McWilliams Maulding
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Luther Stripling
Represented By: Diana McWilliams Maulding
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rudy Kyle
Represented By: Diana McWilliams Maulding
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Elbert Price
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mary Ruth Price
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bud Price's Excavating Service Inc Profit-Sharing Plan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Price's Utility Contractors Inc Retirement Plan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Price's Utility Contractors Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bud Price's Excavating Service Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?