Barber v. Shock et al

Plaintiff: Johnta Q Barber
Defendant: T Shock, J Gramthom, G Wilcox and Frintz
Case Number: 4:2008cv04115
Filed: November 3, 2008
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Prison Condition: Civil Rights Office
County: Faulkner
Referring Judge: Henry L. Jones
Presiding Judge: Brian S. Miller
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
December 8, 2009 68 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT in favor of J Gramthom, T Shock against Johnta Q Barber re 67 Order Adopting Report and Recommendations and dismissing plaintiff's complaint with prejudice. Signed by Judge Brian S. Miller on 12/8/09. (bkp)
November 5, 2009 64 Opinion or Order of the Court PROPOSED FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS recommending that the 48 MOTION for Summary Judgment be granted, and the plaintiff's complaint against defendants be dismissed with prejudice. Objections to R&R due no later than eleven (11) days from the date of the findings and recommendations. Signed by Magistrate Judge Henry L. Jones, Jr on 11/5/09. (bkp) (Docket text modified on 11/6/2009 to correct the descripton of the document filed.) (thd).
May 13, 2009 40 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 39 Response filed by T Shock, J Gramthom providing the Court with the last-known address for Joseph Gramthom; the Clerk is directed to prepare summons for defendant Gramthom and the U.S. Marshal is directed to serve a copy of the summons and original and amended complaint (DE#2,8) on defendant, without prepayment of fees and costs or security therefore. Signed by Magistrate Judge Henry L. Jones, Jr on 5/13/09. (mkf)
April 30, 2009 36 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing defts to file a last-known address of deft Gramtham within 10 days of the date of this Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Henry L. Jones, Jr on 4/30/09. (bkp)
March 30, 2009 30 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 22 Motion to Set Aside 19 Clerk's Entry of Default ; granting 24 Motion for Leave to File an Answer out of time and directing that the attached answer be filed and denying plaintiff's motion for a default judgment against defendants. Signed by Magistrate Judge Henry L. Jones, Jr on 3/30/09. (bkp)
March 4, 2009 18 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 15 Motion for Entry of Default and directing the Clerk to enter default against defendants; and ordering the defts to respond to plaintiff's request for the entry of a default judgment against them within 15 days of the date of this Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Henry L. Jones, Jr on 3/4/09. (bkp)
February 27, 2009 16 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 9 Partial Report and Recommendations and dismissing defts G. Wilcox and Officer Frintz from plaintiff's complaint. Signed by Judge Brian S. Miller on 2/27/09. (bkp)
December 2, 2008 6 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 5 Motion for Joinder and directing the plaintiff to file his amended complaint in accordance with this Court's November 13, 2008 Order within ten days of the date of this Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Henry L. Jones, Jr on 12/2/08. (bkp)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Barber v. Shock et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Johnta Q Barber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: T Shock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J Gramthom
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: G Wilcox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Frintz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?