Blakley v. Schlumberger Technology Corporation et al

Plaintiff: Relenthis Blakley
Defendant: Schlumberger Technology Corporation and Michael Garwood
Case Number: 4:2008cv04120
Filed: November 5, 2008
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Civil Rights: Jobs Office
County: Faulkner
Presiding Judge: William R. Wilson
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 42:2000e Job Discrimination (Employment)

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 28, 2010 68 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT re 67 Order on Motion for Summary Judgment dismissing the case with prejudice. Signed by Judge William R. Wilson, Jr on 7/28/10. (bkp)
July 20, 2010 64 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 60 Motion to Compel; granting in part and denying in part 61 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re 58 MOTION for Summary Judgment ( Replies due by noon on 7/27/2010). Signed by Judge William R. Wilson, Jr on 7/20/10. (bkp)
March 10, 2010 50 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 42 Motion to Dismiss and directing plaintiff's counsel to forthwith pay defendant $1,500.00 to partially defray fees and expenses. Signed by Judge William R. Wilson, Jr on 3/10/10. (bkp)
March 8, 2010 49 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 48 Motion to Quash. Signed by Judge William R. Wilson, Jr on 3/8/10. (bkp)
February 16, 2010 43 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER finding as moot 40 Motion for Reconsideration ; finding as moot 41 Motion to Extend Time: A new scheduling order will be issued pending the outcome of deft's motion to dismiss. Signed by Judge William R. Wilson, Jr on 2/16/10. (bkp)
January 20, 2010 36 Opinion or Order of the Court AMENDMENT TO 35 Order of January 19, 2010 directing plaintiff to file an amended and substituted complaint by 12:00 p.m., February 5, 2010 and to retain local counsel on or before February 5, 2010. Signed by Judge William R. Wilson, Jr on 1/20/10. (bkp)
January 19, 2010 35 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER cancelling the trial currently set for April 13, 2010: Plaintiff's discovery requests are quashed in their entirety and plaintiff is directed to submit pared-down discovery requests by February 10, 2010; this Order is being sent to plaintiff by fax, CM/ECF and by regular mail; and holding in abeyance defendant's request to dismiss this case with prejudice. Signed by Judge William R. Wilson, Jr on 1/19/10. (bkp) Modified on 1/20/2010 to correct typographical error (jct).
January 13, 2010 32 Opinion or Order of the Court LETTER ORDER re 29 MOTION for Protective Order filed by Schlumberger Technology Corporation directing Mr. Okon Usoro to confer with opposing counsel before noon, Tuesday, January 19, 2010, and to immediately advise the Court of the results of that meeting. Signed by Judge William R. Wilson, Jr on 1/13/10. (bkp)
October 15, 2009 23 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 21 Motion to Compel and directing Plaintiff to answer Defendant's First Set of Requests for Production of Documents by 5:00 p.m. on Thursday, October 22, 2009; denying 21 Motion for Sanctions without prejudice. Signed by Judge William R. Wilson, Jr on 10/15/09. (bkp)
February 12, 2009 16 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 7 Motion to Dismiss or in the Alternative to Stay. Signed by Judge William R. Wilson, Jr on 2/12/09. (mkf)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Blakley v. Schlumberger Technology Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Relenthis Blakley
Represented By: Okon J. Usoro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Schlumberger Technology Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Garwood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?