Aaron v. Haltom et al

Plaintiff: Barry G Aaron
Defendant: Brent Haltom and J R Howard
Case Number: 4:2008cv04128
Filed: November 6, 2008
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Prisoner: Civil Rights Office
County: Jefferson
Presiding Judge: G. Thomas Eisele
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 22, 2009 40 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER OF DISMISSAL granting 39 Plaintiff's Motion to Dismiss. Plaintiff's Complaint is hereby dismissed without prejudice. Signed by Judge G. Thomas Eisele on 4/22/09. (hph)
February 5, 2009 17 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 13 Motion for Reconsideration and directing the Clerk to prepare summons for defts Brent Haltom and J.R. Howard and the U.S. Marshal to serve defts with a copy of the complaint, the December 1, 2008 Order and summons without prepayment of fees. Signed by Magistrate Judge Henry L. Jones, Jr on 2/5/09. (bkp)
November 14, 2008 7 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT: pursuant to 5 Memorandum and Order entered in this matter on this date, it is Considered, Ordered and Adjudged that this case be, and it is hereby, dismissed with prejudice, for failure to state a claim. The relief sought is denied. Signed by Judge G. Thomas Eisele on 11/14/08. (hph)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Aaron v. Haltom et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Barry G Aaron
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brent Haltom
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J R Howard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?