Webb v. Faulkner County Detention Center et al

Plaintiff: Jeffery Webb, Jr.
Defendant: Faulkner County Detention Center, Joesph Grantham, Cross County Detention Center and John Collier
Case Number: 4:2008cv04144
Filed: November 12, 2008
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Prison Condition: Civil Rights Office
County: Pulaski
Referring Judge: Henry L. Jones
Presiding Judge: William R. Wilson
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
December 3, 2010 87 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 84 Motion to Dismiss and dismissing case with prejudice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 12/3/10. (bkp)
April 1, 2010 76 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 65 defts' Motion for Summary Judgment with respect to the following: the official capacity claims against Faulkner and Cross Counties, the allegations of injury to his ankle and for mail tampering, and the claims against deft Collier; defts' motion for summary judgment is denied in part with respect to pltf's conditions of confinement, denial of medical care and excessive force claims. Signed by Magistrate Judge Henry L. Jones, Jr on 4/1/10. (tjj)
August 31, 2009 55 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing court-appointed atty Mark Alan Jesse to file a response to 50 MOTION to Withdraw filed by Jeffery Webb, Jr within ten days of the date of this Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Henry L. Jones, Jr on 8/31/09. (bkp)
December 17, 2008 11 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Adopting 6 Partial Report and Recommendations in their entirety as this Court's findings in all respects; Defts Faulkner County Detention Center and Cross County Detention Center are DISMISSED as parties to this action. Signed by Judge William R. Wilson, Jr on 12/17/08. (mkf)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Webb v. Faulkner County Detention Center et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeffery Webb, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Faulkner County Detention Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joesph Grantham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cross County Detention Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Collier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?