Gamble v. Parker et al

Plaintiff: Veronica Gamble
Defendant: Shirley Parker, Co-Tina Williams and Baptist Health
Case Number: 4:2008cv04160
Filed: November 18, 2008
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Civil Rights: Jobs Office
County: Pulaski
Presiding Judge: William R. Wilson
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 42:2000e Job Discrimination (Employment)

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
February 4, 2010 49 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT in favor of Baptist Health, Cotina Williamson, Shirley Parker against Veronica Gamble re 48 Order granting Motion for Summary Judgment and dismissing this case with prejudice. Signed by Judge William R. Wilson, Jr on 2/4/10. (bkp)
February 1, 2010 43 Opinion or Order of the Court LETTER ORDER re 35 Brief in Support filed by Veronica Gamble directing counsel to respond to this letter by noon, Friday, February 5, 2010, by e-mail or fax. Signed by Judge William R. Wilson, Jr on 2/1/10. (bkp)
January 26, 2010 37 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing the Clerk to change the name of defendant Co-Tina Williams to Cotina Williamson. Signed DOC by Mary A. Johnson, Deputy Clerk, on 1/26/10. (bkp)
January 22, 2010 32 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 29 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by defendants, directing the plaintiff to respond to the motion by 12:00 noon, on Friday, January 29, 2010. Signed by Judge William R. Wilson, Jr on 1/22/10. (bkp)
December 3, 2008 5 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Veronica Gamble. Signed by Judge William R. Wilson, Jr on 12/3/08. (bkp)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gamble v. Parker et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Veronica Gamble
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shirley Parker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Co-Tina Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Baptist Health
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?