Abernathy v. Union Pacific Railroad Company

Plaintiff: Winfer Abernathy
Defendant: Union Pacific Railroad Company
Case Number: 4:2008cv04187
Filed: December 8, 2008
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Federal Employer's Liability Office
County: Pulaski
Presiding Judge: William R. Wilson
Nature of Suit: Both
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 45:51 Railways: Fed. Employer's Liability Act

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 16, 2011 186 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part Defendant's 173 motion for discovery sanctions as set forth in this Order. Deadlines for the additional limited discovery and trial date will be set by separate order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Beth Deere on 8/16/2011. (kdr)
May 11, 2011 163 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 149 deft's renewed Motion to Strike Proposed Expert Reports and Exclude the Proposed Expert Testimony. Signed by Judge Billy Roy Wilson on 5/11/11. (kpr)
May 9, 2011 160 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 117 Motion in Limine. Signed by Judge Billy Roy Wilson on 5/9/11. (kpr)
May 5, 2011 155 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 108 Motion in Limine. Signed by Judge Billy Roy Wilson on 5/5/11. (kpr)
May 3, 2011 152 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER permitting plaintiff to call as witnesses David McGee, Lance Phillips, Rodney McCoy, and Jimmy Bowman; and deft will be permitted to depose these witnesses; denying 106 Motion to Strike. Signed by Judge Billy Roy Wilson on 5/3/11. (kpr)
April 20, 2011 135 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER setting ddl to respond to Defendant's 120 122 124 126 128 MOTIONS in Limine until 5:00 p.m., Friday, April 29, 2011; and setting ddl to respond to Plaintiff's Motions in Limine 132] 130 until 5:00 p.m., Friday, April 29, 2011. Signed by Judge Billy Roy Wilson on 4/20/11. (kpr)
April 19, 2011 119 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing plaintiff to respond to deft's most recent 117 MOTION in Limine by 5:00 p.m., Wednesday, April 27, 2011. Signed by Judge Billy Roy Wilson on 4/19/11. (kpr)
April 13, 2011 116 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER finding as moot deft's Daubert motions 53 56 58 65 , and denying 63 Motion to Strike. Signed by Judge Billy Roy Wilson on 4/13/11. (kpr)
March 30, 2011 92 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 81 Motion to Strike ; denying 82 Motion to Strike ; denying 83 Motion to Strike ; denying 86 Motion to Strike ; granting 87 Motion to Strike ; granting 90 Motion for Leave to File Responses Out of Time; denying 91 Motion to Strike. Signed by Judge Billy Roy Wilson on 3/30/11. (kpr)
March 9, 2011 75 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 48 Motion to Compel. Signed by Judge Billy Roy Wilson on 3/9/11. (kpr)
April 6, 2010 35 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 20 Motion for Summary Judgment; granting 23 Motion to Continue; denying 30 Motion to Strike and directing the parties to submit an estimate of the time required for direct exam of each of their witnesses six weeks before the new trial date. Signed by Judge William R. Wilson, Jr on 4/6/10. (bkp)
March 29, 2010 29 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER finding as moot 18 Motion to Compel. Signed by Judge William R. Wilson, Jr on 3/29/10. (bkp)
March 23, 2010 27 Opinion or Order of the Court LETTER ORDER directing parties to meet re discovery dispute. A telephone conference will be held at 2:00 p.m. on Monday, March 29, 2010, if the discovery dispute is not settled before then. Signed by Judge William R. Wilson, Jr on 3/23/10. (bkp)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Abernathy v. Union Pacific Railroad Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Winfer Abernathy
Represented By: Richard John Zalasky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Union Pacific Railroad Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?